This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2018 at 07:55:50 (UTC).

Rawls v. Handicare USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Rawls filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Handicare USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is R Bryan Harwell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02237

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R Bryan Harwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Austin Rawls

Defendant

Handicare USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian A Taylor

Attorney at Hopkins Law Firm

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

Joseph Clay Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins Law Firm

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

William E Hopkins, Jr

Attorney at Hopkins Law Firm

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Applegate Dieck

Attorney at Moore and Van Allen PLLC (Chas)

78 Wentworth Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Lesley Anne Firestone

Attorney at Moore and Van Allen PLLC (Chas)

78 Wentworth Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Brian C Hey

Attorney at McMahon Berger Hanna Liniham Cody and McCarthy

Po Box 31901

St Louis, MO 63131

James N Foster, Jr

Attorney at McMahon Berger Hanna Liniham Cody and McCarthy

Po Box 31901

St Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Austin Rawls. (Hopkins, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

7 #1

Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Handicare USA, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Dieck, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

5 #1

Supporting Documents PHV Application

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James N. Foster, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7949568) by Handicare USA, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Application) No proposed order.(Dieck, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/17/2018 to remove proposed order (lsut, ). (Entered: 08/16/2018)

4 #1

Supporting Documents PHV Application

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian C. Hey (filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-7949565) by Handicare USA, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Application) No proposed order.(Dieck, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/17/2018 to remove proposed order (lsut, ). (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Handicare USA Inc.(dsto, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B-Notice of Filing

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-26-2169. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7941187), filed by Handicare USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing)(dsto, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Austin Rawls. (Hopkins, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Handicare USA, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.(Dieck, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 08/20/2018. (lsut, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James N. Foster, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7949568) by Handicare USA, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Application) No proposed order.(Dieck, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/17/2018 to remove proposed order (lsut, ). (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian C. Hey (filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-7949565) by Handicare USA, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Application) No proposed order.(Dieck, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/17/2018 to remove proposed order (lsut, ). (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Handicare USA Inc.(dsto, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-26-2169. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7941187), filed by Handicare USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing)(dsto, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian A Taylor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Clay Hopkins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William E Hopkins, Jr