This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:22 (UTC).

Ratcliff v. Bexar County Sheriff's Office et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Ratcliff filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bexar County Sheriff's Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth S. Chestney and David A. Ezra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00894

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

Presiding Judge

David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Damond Ratcliff

San Antonio, TX 78207

Defendants

D. Tuter

Bexar County Sheriff's Office

Bexar County Adult Detention Center

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of DAMOND RATCLIFF, SID #722322. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg) (Copy of this order mailed to the Custodian of BCADC Detainee Trust Fund, BCADC, 200 N. Comal St., San Antonio, Texas 78207) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#4

(#4) SERVICE ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall request the U.S. Marshal personally serve Defendants D. Tuter and Bexar County with a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs Civil Rights Complaint [#1], and this Order. Bexar County shall be served by service on Bexar County Sheriff Javier Salazar. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damond Ratcliff. Bexar County Sheriff's Office served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (rg) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#5

(#5) USM-285 Forms along with Summons, Copy of the Complaint and Copy of Order, Document #4 sent to the USMS for service. (rg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Damond Ratcliff. (rg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

1 #2

Copy of Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Damond Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(fs) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damond Ratcliff.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damond Ratcliff. Bexar County Sheriff's Office served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (rg) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Damond Ratcliff. (rg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) USM-285 Forms along with Summons, Copy of the Complaint and Copy of Order, Document #4 sent to the USMS for service. (rg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SERVICE ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall request the U.S. Marshal personally serve Defendants D. Tuter and Bexar County with a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs Civil Rights Complaint [#1], and this Order. Bexar County shall be served by service on Bexar County Sheriff Javier Salazar. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of DAMOND RATCLIFF, SID #722322. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg) (Copy of this order mailed to the Custodian of BCADC Detainee Trust Fund, BCADC, 200 N. Comal St., San Antonio, Texas 78207) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damond Ratcliff.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Damond Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(fs) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (fs) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less