This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:29 (UTC).

Rashid K. Khalfani v. United States Sercurities and Exchange Commission et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Rashid K Khalfani filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Sercurities and Exchange Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07413

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rashid K Khalfani

Claremont, CA 91711

Defendants

Kathy Phelps

Diamond McCarthy LLP

Mosier Company

United States Sercurities and Exchange Commission

Junling Ma

Amy J. Longo

Robert P. Mosier

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:15-cv-00980 JLS(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07413 JLS(RAO). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani, upon Defendant Junling Ma served on 8/23/2018 by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

CV-71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against defendants Diamond McCarthy LLP, Amy J. Longo(in her individual capacity), Amy J. Longo(in her official capacity), Junling Ma(in her individual capacity), Junling Ma(in her official capacity), Robert P. Mosier(in his official capacity), Robert P. Mosier(in his individual capacity), Mosier Company, Kathy Phelps(in her individual capacity), Kathy Phelps(in her official capacity), United States Sercurities and Exchange Commission Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, (Filing fee$400 paid), filed by plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani, upon Defendant Amy J. Longo served on 8/23/2018. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani, upon Defendant Kathy Phelps served on 8/23/2018 by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rashid K. Khalfani upon Defendant Robert P. Mosier served on 8/23/2018 by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:15-cv-00980 JLS(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07413 JLS(RAO). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rashid K. Khalfani upon Defendant Robert P. Mosier served on 8/23/2018 by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani, upon Defendant Kathy Phelps served on 8/23/2018 by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani, upon Defendant Amy J. Longo served on 8/23/2018. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani, upon Defendant Junling Ma served on 8/23/2018 by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed against defendants Diamond McCarthy LLP, Amy J. Longo(in her individual capacity), Amy J. Longo(in her official capacity), Junling Ma(in her individual capacity), Junling Ma(in her official capacity), Robert P. Mosier(in his official capacity), Robert P. Mosier(in his individual capacity), Mosier Company, Kathy Phelps(in her individual capacity), Kathy Phelps(in her official capacity), United States Sercurities and Exchange Commission Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, (Filing fee$400 paid), filed by plaintiff Rashid K Khalfani. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.