This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2020 at 00:28:25 (UTC).

Rangel, et al v. Adtalem Global Education, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 Rangel filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Adtalem Global Education, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Ezra, Elizabeth S. Chestney and Jason K. Pulliam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

Presiding Judges

David A. Ezra

Jason K. Pulliam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tiffany Brown

Christopher Martin

Younghee Bermingham

Tristen Wilson

Crystal Hayden

Joanna Aguilera

Frankie Early, Jr.

George Van-Lare

Jose Sanchez

Christina Cabello

Melissa Wilson

Justin Wiggins

Martin Oloyede

Patrick Acheampong

Kinney Barcuch

Christian Burrow

Rhonda James

Saul Vega

Kevin D. Earls

Terrell White

101 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John R. Fabry

Attorney at The Carlson Law Firm, P.C.

1717 N. I-35, Suite 305

Round Rock, TX 77664

Jose Luis Munoz

Attorney at The Carlson Law Firm, P.C.

1717 N. Interstate Highway 35, Suite 305

Round Rock, TX 78664

Other Attorneys

Terance A. Gonsalves

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

115 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60603

Stephen K. Lecholop, II

Attorney at Rosenthal Paurestein Sandoloski Agather LLP

755 East Mulberry Suite 200

San Antonio, TX 78212

 

Court Documents

#87

(#87) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#86

(#86) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #77 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 64) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#85

(#85) ORDER DENYING #80 Motion to Lift Stay Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

84 #1

Exhibit A

#84

(#84) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Luis Rangel, re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fabry, John) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

80 #1

Proposed Order

#80

Text Order REFERRING #80 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery to Magistrate Judge Chestney for disposition. Entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#77

(#83) OBJECTION to #77 Report and Recommendations by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc... (Lecholop, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#64

(#84) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Luis Rangel, re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fabry, John) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Order for Scheduling recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terance A. Gonsalves for Adtalem Global Education, Inc.,Terance A. Gonsalves for DeVry University, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terance A. Gonsalves for Adtalem Global Education, Inc.,Terance A. Gonsalves for DeVry University, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. Attorney Stephen K. Lecholop, II added to party Adtalem Global Education, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lecholop, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Rangel as to All Defendants. (Fabry, John) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Letter to Attorney Jose Luis Munoz regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10396723). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Luis Rangel, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabry, John) Modified on 1/26/2018 to add filers(mgr). (Entered: 01/25/2018)

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #77 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 64) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #80 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery (mgr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) ORDER DENYING #80 Motion to Lift Stay Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Luis Rangel, re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fabry, John) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) OBJECTION to #77 Report and Recommendations by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc... (Lecholop, Stephen) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Luis Rangel, re #80 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery filed by Plaintiff Luis Rangel Reply in Support of Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fabry, John) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #80 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery filed by Plaintiff Luis Rangel (Andrichik, William) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #80 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of Discovery. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rf) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #80 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery to Magistrate Judge Chestney for disposition. Entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance) Modified on 4/24/2018, to add filer(mgr). (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order for Scheduling recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terance A. Gonsalves for Adtalem Global Education, Inc.,Terance A. Gonsalves for DeVry University, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Terance Gonsalves ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10629085) by on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lecholop, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. Attorney Stephen K. Lecholop, II added to party Adtalem Global Education, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lecholop, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Rangel as to All Defendants. (Fabry, John) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Attorney Jose Luis Munoz regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10396723). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Luis Rangel, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabry, John) Modified on 1/26/2018 to add filers(mgr). (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.