This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:44:20 (UTC).

Ramirez v. New Haven

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Ramirez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against New Haven. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Warren W. Eginton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01353

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Warren W. Eginton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William F. Ramirez

Defendant

City of New Haven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas W. Bucci

Attorney at Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.

855 Main St., Fifth Floor

Bridgeport, CT 06604

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Molloy Neary

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

265 Church Street, Ste 300

New Haven, CT 06510

Jason R. Stanevich

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.- NH, CT

One Century Tower, Suite 300, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled in this case for October 31, 2018 at 9:30am. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions for the conference. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/9/2018.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#13

(#13) Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neary, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neary, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Molloy Neary on behalf of City of New Haven (Neary, Christopher) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William F. Ramirez. City of New Haven served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of New Haven* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.* *855 Main St., Fifth Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William F. Ramirez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#4

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William F. Ramirez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#3

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William F. Ramirez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#2

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William F. Ramirez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#1

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William F. Ramirez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled in this case for October 31, 2018 at 9:30am. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions for the conference. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/9/2018.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • (#18) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 10/31/2018 at 09:30 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • (#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2018. 6 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#16) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is scheduled for 10/9/2018 at 9:30 AM with Judge Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 60 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Set Deadlines/: Discovery due by 5/15/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2019 (Gould, K.) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/01/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER approving #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is due May 15, 2019. Dispositive motions are due June 15, 2019. The case will be referred for an early settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/1/18.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neary, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neary, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Answer deadline updated for City of New Haven to 10/15/2018. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Molloy Neary on behalf of City of New Haven (Neary, Christopher) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William F. Ramirez. City of New Haven served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of New Haven* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.* *855 Main St., Fifth Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by William F. Ramirez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/13/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/13/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2018 Discovery due by 2/12/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2019 Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2018.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to City of New Haven. (Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City of New Haven ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4932981.), filed by William F Ramirez.(Bucci, Thomas) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less