This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2018 at 07:29:34 (UTC).

Rainbow International LLC v. Dill Contracting and Properties Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Rainbow International LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Dill Contract ing and Properties Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey C. Manske and Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rainbow International LLC

Defendants

Eric Michael Dill

Dill Contracting and Properties Inc

Chelanie Dill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Michelle Mehta

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, LLP

4125 West Waco Drive

Waco, TX 76710

James R. Dunnam

Attorney at Dunnam, Dunnam, etal

4125 W. Waco Dr., P.O. Box 8418

Waco, TX 76714-8418

Defendant Attorneys

David N. Deaconson

Attorney at Pakis, Giotes, Page & Burleson

P.O. Box 58

Waco, TX 76703-0058

Travis Blake

Attorney at Pakis Giotes Page & Burleson P.C.

400 Austin Ave., Suite 400

Waco, TX 76701

 

Court Documents

#7

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit Ex C - Civil Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Ex B - Citations

1 #3

Exhibit Ex A (part 2) - Plaintiff's Original Petition with attachments

1 #2

Exhibit Ex A (part 1) - Plaintiff's Original Petition with attachments

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT to #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rainbow International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Andrea) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by Rainbow International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Mehta, Andrea) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rainbow International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Mehta, Andrea) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendants' Original ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chelanie Dill, Eric Michael Dill, Dill Contracting and Properties Inc.(Blake, Travis) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Eric Michael Dill, Dill Contracting and Properties Inc. (Blake, Travis) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jch) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eric Michael Dill, Dill Contracting and Properties Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11033890), filed by Eric Michael Dill, Dill Contracting and Properties Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A (part 1) - Plaintiff's Original Petition with attachments, #3 Exhibit Ex A (part 2) - Plaintiff's Original Petition with attachments, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Citations, #5 Exhibit Ex C - Civil Docket Sheet)(Blake, Travis) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea Michelle Mehta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Dunnam