This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2018 at 07:56:44 (UTC).

Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc. v. Kiekert AG

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Rainbow Chevrolet, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Kiekert AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Marianne O. Battani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-04302

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Marianne O. Battani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hartley Buick GMC Truck, Inc.

Pitre, Inc.

Landers McLarty Fayetteville TN, LLC

Reno Dodge Sales, Inc.

Patsy Lou Chevrolet, Inc.

Panama City Automotive Group, Inc.

Landers McLarty Lees Summit Mo, LLC

Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc.

Cannon Nissan of Jackson, LLC

Central Salt Lake Valley GMC Enterprises, LLC

Capitol Chevrolet Cadillac, Inc.

Lee Pontiac-Oldsmobile-GMC Truck, Inc.

McGrath Automotive Group, Inc.

Thornhill Superstore, Inc.

Lee Oldsmobile-Cadillac, Inc.

Stoebner Holdings, Inc.

Ramey Motors, Inc.

Empire Nissan of Santa Rosa

John Greene Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC

Defendant

Kiekert U.S.A., Inc.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander E. Blum

Attorney at Mantese Honigman, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Rd.

Troy, MI 48083

Gerard V. Mantese

Attorney at Mantese Honigman, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Other Attorneys

John C. Kakinuki

Attorney at Kakinuki Law Office, PC

1000 Fourth St.

San Rafael, CA 94901-3118

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter

2 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Marie Thomas - Round 3 - General Litigation Fund

2 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Marie Thomas - Round 3 - Court One

2 #4

Exhibit Declaration of Marie Thomas - Round 3 - Court Two

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit 1-Settlement Agreement

#5

5 #1

Exhibit 1-Settlement Agreement

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION re #2 MOTION for Attorney Fees , REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND A SET ASIDE FOR FUTURE LITIGATION EXPENSES FROM ROUND THREE SETTLEMENTS DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. CUNEO CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY CUNEO GILBERT & LADUCA, LLP; DECLARATION OF CHARLES BARRETT CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY NEAL & HARWELL, PLC; DECLARATION OF BRIAN HERRINGTON CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY HERRINGTON LAW, P.A.; DECLARATION OF JOHN C. KAKINUKI CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY KAKINUKI LAW OFFICE, PC; DECLARATION OF THOMAS P. THRASH CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A.; DECLARATION OF GERARD V. MANTESE CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY MANTESE HONIGMAN, PC; DECLARATION OF DEWITT M. LOVELACE CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY LOVELACE AND ASSOCIATES, P.A.; DECLARATION OF PIERCE GORE CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY PRATT AND ASSOCIATES, P.A.; DECLARATION OF SHAWN M. RAITER CONCERNING TIME AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY LARSON KING, LLP. filed by Dealership Plaintiffs (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended MOTION re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Brose Defendants and Provisional Certification of Settlement Class by Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Settlement Agreement) (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Brose Defendants and Provisional Certification of Settlement Class by Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Settlement Agreement) (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Kakinuki on behalf of Dealership Plaintiffs. (Kakinuki, John) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Attorney Fees , REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND A SET ASIDE FOR FUTURE LITIGATION EXPENSES FROM ROUND THREE SETTLEMENTS by Dealership Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Marie Thomas - Round 3 - General Litigation Fund, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Marie Thomas - Round 3 - Court One, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Marie Thomas - Round 3 - Court Two) (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Set Aside Funds from Round Three Settlements for Future Requests for Class Representative Service Awards by Dealership Plaintiffs. (Mantese, Gerard) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stoebner Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Empire Nissan of Santa Rosa is a litigant

Latest cases where Herb Hallman Chevrolet, Inc. is a litigant