This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2018 at 07:01:53 (UTC).

Rags to Royals v. Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 Rags to Royals filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin Reidinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rags to Royals

Defendants

Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.

Robin Underwood Bowden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rebecca E. Crandall

Attorney at McGuire Wood & Bissette

48 Patton Ave

Asheville, NC 28801

Defendant Attorney

Anthony Joseph Biller

Attorney at Coats & Bennett, P.L.L.C.

1400 Crescent Green Dr., Suite 300

Cary, NC 27511

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of James Underwood filed by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Biller on behalf of Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Reissued Electronically as to Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (ejb) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc., Robin Underwood Bowden. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding trademark number 5,086,545 contained in #1 Complaint. (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rags to Royals (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (ejb). (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Crandall on behalf of Rags to Royals. (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text to change from a Motion to a Notice of Appearance and terminate as a pending motion on 2/13/2018. NEF Regenerated. (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

1 #1

Exhibits to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3594695), filed by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint)(Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (ejb). (Entered: 02/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of James Underwood filed by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Text of Order: The Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendants shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including April 9, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/2/18. (LMR) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc.. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Biller on behalf of Robin Underwood Bowden, Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. (Biller, Anthony) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Reissued Electronically as to Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (ejb) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Rags 2 Royalty Rescue, Inc., Robin Underwood Bowden. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding trademark number 5,086,545 contained in #1 Complaint. (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rags to Royals (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (ejb). (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Crandall on behalf of Rags to Royals. (Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text to change from a Motion to a Notice of Appearance and terminate as a pending motion on 2/13/2018. NEF Regenerated. (ejb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3594695), filed by Rags to Royals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint)(Crandall, Rebecca) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (ejb). (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J BILLER