This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 07:41:28 (UTC).

Raggs v. PNS Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 Raggs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PNS Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmond E. Chang and Sheila M. Finnegan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-10281

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Edmond E. Chang

Sheila M. Finnegan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Raggs

Rosie Raggs

Defendants

PNS Stores, Inc

Big Lots Stores, Inc.

PNS Stores, Inc.

Big Lots Capital, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph W. Lauer

Attorney at Whiteside & Goldberg, Ltd.

155 N. Michigan, Suite 540

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael J Goldberg

Attorney at Whiteside & Goldberg Ltd

155 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 740

Chicago, IL 60601

Brent R Eames

Attorney at Eames Law Group, Ltd.

47 W. Polk Street, Ste. 320

Chicago, IL 60605

Daniel John McGarry

Attorney at Whiteside & Goldberg, Ltd.

155 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 540

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Frank T. Blechschmidt

Attorney at Central States Law Department

8647 West Higgins Road, 8Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60631

John Sheldon Letchinger

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew J Caccamo

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606-2841

Josephine Tung

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

191 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation to dismiss #44 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is dismissed with prejudice as to all all claims, causes of actions, and parties, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Telephone status set on 12/14/2017 is cancelled. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#44

(#44) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Caccamo, Matthew) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#43

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: By agreement of the parties, the telephone status hearing set on 11/30/2017 is cancelled and reset to 12/14/2017 at 10:45 a.m. Dial in information to remain.Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 11/28/2017)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Telephone status hearing held on 11/17/2018 and continued to 11/30/2017 at 4:30 p.m. Only Plaintiff's counsel appeared and provided update. Parties may contact the Courtroom Deputy (312-408-5110) to reschedule the hearing if they resolve the final remaining issue and will soon be filing a stipulation to dismiss. To join the next telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831, Access code is 5995354, Press #. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#41

(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: At defense counsel's written request and by agreement, the telephone status hearing set on 9/25/2017 is cancelled and reset to 11/27/2017 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

#40

(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Settlement conference held on 07/26/2017. Parties reached a settlement agreement and summarized the confidential terms on the record. The transcript of this proceeding is ordered to be placed under seal until further order of the court. The parties are to promptly prepare and exchange settlement documents. Telephonic status hearing set for 9/25/2017 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831. Access code is 5995354. The status hearing will be cancelled if a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the hearing. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2017)

#39

(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2017 at 1:30 p.m. at the request of the parties. Plaintiff's counsel is to provide a settlement letter to defense counsel by 7/5/2017. Defense counsel is to provide a responsive letter to plaintiff's counsel by 7/19/2017. Each party is to provide its letter to Judge Finnegan (by e-mail to Proposed_Order_Finnegan@ilnd.uscourts.gov) on the same day that the letter is sent to opposing counsel. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Finnegan's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences (available on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov by selecting the link for Magistrate Judge Finnegan and then the link for "Settlement Conferences"). Status hearing set on 6/5/2017 is cancelled. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Status hearing held on 3/15/2017 and continued to 6/5/2017 at 9:30 a.m. for telephone status. Parties report that they have exchanged written discovery, are in the process of scheduling depositions, and expect to complete fact discovery by the deadline of 5/31/2017 (except treating medical providers who may be deposed after a settlement conference). Parties are to identify available dates for a settlement conference and provide these to the courtroom deputy by 3/29/2017 by telephone (312-408-5110) or email (Proposed_Order_Finnegan@ilnd.uscourts.gov). Parties are also advised to research any existing medical liens prior to the settlement conference. To join the telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831, Access code is 5995354, Press #.Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 03/15/2017)

#37

(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNS Stores, Inc. by Josephine Tung (Tung, Josephine) (Entered: 03/15/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Big Lots Capital, Inc. (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. by Frank T. Blechschmidt (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Kane County Circuit Court, case number (16-L-472) filed by Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12529002. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation to dismiss #44 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is dismissed with prejudice as to all all claims, causes of actions, and parties, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Telephone status set on 12/14/2017 is cancelled. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Caccamo, Matthew) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: By agreement of the parties, the telephone status hearing set on 11/30/2017 is cancelled and reset to 12/14/2017 at 10:45 a.m. Dial in information to remain.Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Telephone status hearing held on 11/17/2018 and continued to 11/30/2017 at 4:30 p.m. Only Plaintiff's counsel appeared and provided update. Parties may contact the Courtroom Deputy (312-408-5110) to reschedule the hearing if they resolve the final remaining issue and will soon be filing a stipulation to dismiss. To join the next telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831, Access code is 5995354, Press #. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: At defense counsel's written request and by agreement, the telephone status hearing set on 9/25/2017 is cancelled and reset to 11/27/2017 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Settlement conference held on 07/26/2017. Parties reached a settlement agreement and summarized the confidential terms on the record. The transcript of this proceeding is ordered to be placed under seal until further order of the court. The parties are to promptly prepare and exchange settlement documents. Telephonic status hearing set for 9/25/2017 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831. Access code is 5995354. The status hearing will be cancelled if a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the hearing. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2017 at 1:30 p.m. at the request of the parties. Plaintiff's counsel is to provide a settlement letter to defense counsel by 7/5/2017. Defense counsel is to provide a responsive letter to plaintiff's counsel by 7/19/2017. Each party is to provide its letter to Judge Finnegan (by e-mail to Proposed_Order_Finnegan@ilnd.uscourts.gov) on the same day that the letter is sent to opposing counsel. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Finnegan's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences (available on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov by selecting the link for Magistrate Judge Finnegan and then the link for "Settlement Conferences"). Status hearing set on 6/5/2017 is cancelled. Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Status hearing held on 3/15/2017 and continued to 6/5/2017 at 9:30 a.m. for telephone status. Parties report that they have exchanged written discovery, are in the process of scheduling depositions, and expect to complete fact discovery by the deadline of 5/31/2017 (except treating medical providers who may be deposed after a settlement conference). Parties are to identify available dates for a settlement conference and provide these to the courtroom deputy by 3/29/2017 by telephone (312-408-5110) or email (Proposed_Order_Finnegan@ilnd.uscourts.gov). Parties are also advised to research any existing medical liens prior to the settlement conference. To join the telephone status hearing, dial (877) 336-1831, Access code is 5995354, Press #.Mailed notice (sxw, ) (Entered: 03/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNS Stores, Inc. by Josephine Tung (Tung, Josephine) (Entered: 03/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE of Service by Joseph W. Lauer on behalf of Rosie Raggs (Lauer, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record via email. (ph, ) (Entered: 11/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by PNS Stores, Inc. (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Big Lots Stores, Inc. (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Big Lots Capital, Inc. (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (yt) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. by Frank T. Blechschmidt (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Kane County Circuit Court, case number (16-L-472) filed by Big Lots Capital, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., PNS Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12529002. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blechschmidt, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNS Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel John McGarry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Goldberg