This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2018 at 08:08:13 (UTC).

Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC v. E-Go Bike LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against E-Go Bike LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01524

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Defendants

E-Go Bike LLC

Bing Liu

Amicus Curiae

Rack'em Mfg LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Frederick A. Tecce

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Richard S Mandaro

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#12

#11

10 #7

Proposed Order

10 #6

Certificate of Nonconcurrence

10 #5

Exhibit(s) Exhibit D in Support of Motion to Dismiss

10 #4

Exhibit(s) Exhibit C in Support of Motion to Dismiss

10 #3

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B in Support of Motion to Dismiss

10 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A In Support of Motion to Dismiss

10 #1

Memo Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bing Liu, E-Go Bike LLC, filed by Rack'em Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-Go Bike LLC. (Tecce, Frederick) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Certificate of Service and Memorandum in Support Thereof by E-Go Bike LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #7 Proposed Order)(Tecce, Frederick) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC. E-Go Bike LLC served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Anthony Lo Cicero and Richard Mandaro are both currently registered with the NY state bar. Associate counsel, Anthony Magnotta is active with the PA state bar. (lh) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Anthony F. Lo Cicero, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/13/18. (jam) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Richard S. Mandaro, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/13/18. (jam) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Richard S Mandaro on behalf of Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC Attorney Richard Mandaro is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4511092.. (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anthony F Lo Cicero on behalf of Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC Attorney Anthony Lo Cicero is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4511079.. (Lo Cicero, Anthony) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/2/18. (jam) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC. (Mandaro, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Bing Liu, E-Go Bike LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rm) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bing Liu, E-Go Bike LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4501461), filed by Rack'Em Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rm) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less