Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 11:47:45 (UTC).

R3 LLC v. Nemeth

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 R3 LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Nemeth. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T. S. Ellis, III and John F. Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R3 LLC

Defendants

Zsolt Nemeth

Zsolt Nemeth doing business as R3 Security (British Virgin Islands) doing business as R3Sec Ltd. (Estonia) doing business as R3Sec Ltd. (Slovenia) doing business as r3sec.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brendan James Sepulveda

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP (DC)

1001 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

David J. Ervin

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP (DC)

1001 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STIPULATED ORDER ON REQUEST FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/02/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

23 #1

Proposed Order

#23

(#23) MOTION for Permanent Injunction , Stipulated Request for Entry of Permanent Injuction by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#22

(#22) STIPULATED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/11/18. (tarm) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

#21

(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2018. Appearance of counsel for plaintiff. Stipulated Request for Entry of Preliminary Injunction #19 - Granted, Stipulated Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction entered by the Court. (Court Reporter: T. Harris)(tarm) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Ervin on behalf of R3 LLC (Ervin, David) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, Defendant and Plaintiff, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, agree to stipulate to the injunction and respectfully request that the Court enter the Stipulated Preliminary Injunction attached hereto, by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

6 #7

Ex. 7 to Ramsey Declaration

6 #6

Ex. 6 to Ramsey Declaration

6 #5

Ex. 5 to Ramsey Declaration

#5

(#5) Brief in Support to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, filed by R3 LLC. (Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by R3 LLC. (Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by R3 LLC. (Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Zsolt Nemeth (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6057716) filed by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATED ORDER ON REQUEST FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/02/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Permanent Injunction , Stipulated Request for Entry of Permanent Injuction by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/11/18. (tarm) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2018. Appearance of counsel for plaintiff. Stipulated Request for Entry of Preliminary Injunction #19 - Granted, Stipulated Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction entered by the Court. (Court Reporter: T. Harris)(tarm) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Ervin on behalf of R3 LLC (Ervin, David) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, Defendant and Plaintiff, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, agree to stipulate to the injunction and respectfully request that the Court enter the Stipulated Preliminary Injunction attached hereto, by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 05/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPer TSE chambers, Motion #4 previously set for 5/11/2018 @ 10:00AM reset for 5/11/2018 at 03:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (mpha) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction,. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, ) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction,. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, ) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Issued as to Zsolt Nemeth. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, ) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Declaration re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, [Declaration of Benjamin Evans] by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 to Evans Declaration)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Declaration re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, [Declaration of Tim Swanson] by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 to Swanson Declaration)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by R3 LLC re #7 Declaration, [Additional exhibits to Charles Cooper, Jr. Declaration] (Attachments: #1 Ex. 9 to Cooper Declaration, #2 Ex. 10 to Cooper Declaration, #3 Ex. 11 to Cooper Declaration, #4 Ex. 12 to Cooper Declaration, #5 Ex. 13 to Cooper Declaration, #6 Ex. 14 to Cooper Declaration, #7 Ex. 15 to Cooper Declaration, #8 Ex. 16 to Cooper Declaration, #9 Ex. 17 to Cooper Declaration, #10 Ex. 18 to Cooper Declaration, #11 Ex. 19 to Cooper Declaration, #12 Ex. 20 to Cooper Declaration, #13 Ex. 21 to Cooper Declaration, #14 Ex. 22 to Cooper Declaration, #15 Ex. 23 to Cooper Declaration, #16 Ex. 24 to Cooper Declaration, #17 Ex. 25 to Cooper Declaration)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, [Declaration of Charles Cooper, Jr.] by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 to Cooper Declaration, #2 Ex. 2 to Cooper Declaration, #3 Ex. 3 to Cooper Declaration, #4 Ex. 4 to Cooper Declaration, #5 Ex. 5 to Cooper Declaration, #6 Ex. 6 to Cooper Declaration, #7 Ex. 7 to Cooper Declaration, #8 Ex. 8 to Cooper Declaration)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, [Declaration of Gabriel M. Ramsey, Esq.] by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 to Ramsey Declaration, #2 Ex. 2 to Ramsey Declaration, #3 Ex. 3 to Ramsey Declaration, #4 Ex. 4 to Ramsey Declaration, #5 Ex. 5 to Ramsey Declaration, #6 Ex. 6 to Ramsey Declaration, #7 Ex. 7 to Ramsey Declaration)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief in Support to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, filed by R3 LLC. (Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause for a preliminary injunction, by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of requested TRO application hearing.)(Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by R3 LLC. (Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by R3 LLC. (Sepulveda, Brendan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zsolt Nemeth (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6057716) filed by R3 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less