This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:40:20 (UTC).

Quora, Inc. v. Quora Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 Quora, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Quora Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01414

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quora, Inc.

Defendant

Quora Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura M. Franco

Jennifer A. Golinveaux

Diana L. Leiden

Defendant Attorneys

Ian Ballon

Nina Diana Boyajian

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/24/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/17/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/14/2017. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/24/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/17/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/14/2017. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUORA INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nina D. Boyajian