This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 at 07:29:18 (UTC).

Quinn v. Department of Justice

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Quinn filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Jarvey and Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00291

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Quinn

Defendants

Central Iowa Shelter Services

HyVee Inc.

City of Des Moines

Des Moines Police Department

Department of Justice

Department of Human Services

Polk County Sheriff's Department

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Central Iowa Shelter Services, City of Des Moines, Department of Human Services, Department of Justice, Des Moines Police Department, HyVee Inc., Polk County Sheriff's Department against Andrew Quinn. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 9/27/2018. (don) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case is dismissed. The clerk shall enter judgment for the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/27/2018. (mem) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Quinn. (kjw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Central Iowa Shelter Services, City of Des Moines, Department of Human Services, Department of Justice, Des Moines Police Department, HyVee Inc., Polk County Sheriff's Department, filed by Andrew Quinn. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/5/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/5/2018. (kjw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Central Iowa Shelter Services, City of Des Moines, Department of Human Services, Department of Justice, Des Moines Police Department, HyVee Inc., Polk County Sheriff's Department against Andrew Quinn. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 9/27/2018. (don) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case is dismissed. The clerk shall enter judgment for the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/27/2018. (mem) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Quinn. (kjw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew Quinn. See entry #1 . Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (kjw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Central Iowa Shelter Services, City of Des Moines, Department of Human Services, Department of Justice, Des Moines Police Department, HyVee Inc., Polk County Sheriff's Department, filed by Andrew Quinn. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/5/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/5/2018. (kjw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less