This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:46:27 (UTC).

QUINCY et al v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 QUINCY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CINDI JUNE STACKHOUSE

GARY QUINCY

Defendant

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARD GOLDEN

Attorney at CLIFFORD & GOLDEN, P.A.

5 Maple Street, Po Box 368, 353-9366

Lisbon Falls, ME 04252

JOSHUA KLEIN-GOLDEN

Attorney at CLIFFORD & GOLDEN, P.A.

5 Maple Street, Po Box 368

Lisbon Falls, ME 04252

Defendant Attorney

DUNCAN A. EDGAR

Attorney at SANDELANDS EYET LLP

1545 U.S. Highway 206, Suite 304

Bedminster, NJ 07921

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/16/2019. Motions due by 1/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mtm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC.(EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#9

(#9) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA KLEIN-GOLDEN on behalf of GARY QUINCY, CINDI JUNE STACKHOUSE (KLEIN-GOLDEN, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer and State Court Record by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Responses due by 8/9/2018. (EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#3

(#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/24/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

1 #4

notice of filing removal

1 #3

notice of service of process

1 #2

summons

1 #1

complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maine District Court Bridgton, case number CV-2018-49. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2018) Fee due by 7/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 notice of service of process, #4 notice of filing removal)(bfa) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/16/2019. Motions due by 1/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 4/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mtm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC.(EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA KLEIN-GOLDEN on behalf of GARY QUINCY, CINDI JUNE STACKHOUSE (KLEIN-GOLDEN, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Per Amended Order #7: Answer due by 8/23/2018. State Court Record due by 8/23/2018. (sfw) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED ORDER re 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer and State Court Record filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. The defendant's Consent Motion to Extend Time is granted without objection. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint and file the state court record by August 23, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by August 23, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer and State Court Record by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Responses due by 8/9/2018. (EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1871161.), filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC.(EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (EDGAR, DUNCAN) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Set Deadlines : Attorney Richard Golden shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 7/24/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (bfa) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/24/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Set Answer Deadline for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC : Answer due by 7/24/2018. (bfa) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/24/2018. (bfa) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maine District Court Bridgton, case number CV-2018-49. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2018) Fee due by 7/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 notice of service of process, #4 notice of filing removal)(bfa) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less