This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2018 at 07:01:41 (UTC).

Pulse Electronics, Inc. v. U.D. Electronic Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Pulse Electronics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against U D Electronic Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William V. Gallo, Anthony J. Battaglia and Roger T. Benitez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

Presiding Judges

Anthony J. Battaglia

Roger T. Benitez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pulse Electronics, Inc.

Defendant

U.D. Electronic Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Spencer Garson

Attorney at Gazdzinski & Associates, PC

16644 West Bernardo Drive, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92127

Defendant Attorney

Dave S. Deonarine

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

12544 High Bluff Drive, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting Joint #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer U.D. Electronic Corp. Defendants Response due 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/10/2018. (anh) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.D. Electronic Corp.. (Deonarine, Dave)Attorney Dave S. Deonarine added to party U.D. Electronic Corp.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 04/09/2018)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pulse Electronics, Inc.. U.D. Electronic Corp. served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garson, Adam) (jpp). (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Pulse Electronics, Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate Oaktree Capital Group, LLC for Pulse Electronics, Inc. (Garson, Adam) QC Mailer sent re: Missing proof of service (anh). (jao). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mxn) (jao). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6, 773,302 B2*, *7,959,473 B2*, *9,178,318 B2*, *6,593,840 B2* cc:USPTO (mxn) (jao). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

1 #13

Exhibit K

1 #12

Exhibit J

1 #11

Exhibit I

1 #9

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Table of Contents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against U.D. Electronic Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-10928606.), filed by Pulse Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)The new case number is 3:18-cv-373-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Garson, Adam)(mxn) (jao). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting Joint #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer U.D. Electronic Corp. Defendants Response due 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/10/2018. (anh) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.D. Electronic Corp.. (Deonarine, Dave)Attorney Dave S. Deonarine added to party U.D. Electronic Corp.(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pulse Electronics, Inc.. U.D. Electronic Corp. served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garson, Adam) (jpp). (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Pulse Electronics, Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate Oaktree Capital Group, LLC for Pulse Electronics, Inc. (Garson, Adam) QC Mailer sent re: Missing proof of service (anh). (jao). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv373 BEN (WVG).(no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mxn) (jao). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6, 773,302 B2*, *7,959,473 B2*, *9,178,318 B2*, *6,593,840 B2* cc:USPTO (mxn) (jao). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against U.D. Electronic Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-10928606.), filed by Pulse Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)The new case number is 3:18-cv-373-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Garson, Adam)(mxn) (jao). (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.