This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2018 at 06:06:46 (UTC).

Puckett v. .. et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 Puckett filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04078

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Undrea Puckett

Sumner, IL 62466

Defendants

Jane Does

John Does

Brendi Hendrix

Marsha ..

John Varga

Mints

Nancy King

Daniel Conn

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Appearance Form for Pro Se Litigants filed by Undrea Puckett. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Service of Process at Govt Expense by Plaintiff Undrea Puckett. Responses due by 4/25/2018 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Undrea Puckett. Responses due by 4/25/2018 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

3 #1

IFP

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Undrea Puckett. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

2 #1

NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 5/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

1 #6

Certificate of Service

1 #5

Exhibit 2 part 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2 part 2

1 #3

Exhibit 2 part 1

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Undrea Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 part 2, #5 Exhibit 2 part 3)(VH, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2018: #6 Certificate of Service) (VH, ilcd). (Entered: 04/11/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 4/11/2018. The Plaintiff, a state prisoner, has submitted a civil rights complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Such actions may be brought only in (1) the judicial district where any defendant resides (if all defendants reside in the same State), (2) a judicial district in which a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred, or (3) a judicial district in which any defendant may be found, if there is no district in which the action may otherwise be brought. See 28 U.S.C. 1391(b). The Plaintiff's claims involve Defendants and events at Dixon Correctional Center in Lee County, Illinois, which is situated in the federal judicial district for the Northern District of Illinois. Therefore, the Court finds venue over this proceeding lies in the Northern District of Illinois, and it is in the interests of justice that this cause be transferred there. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Civil Case Terminated. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appearance Form for Pro Se Litigants filed by Undrea Puckett. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Service of Process at Govt Expense by Plaintiff Undrea Puckett. Responses due by 4/25/2018 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Undrea Puckett. Responses due by 4/25/2018 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Undrea Puckett. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 5/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Undrea Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 part 2, #5 Exhibit 2 part 3)(VH, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2018: #6 Certificate of Service) (VH, ilcd). (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less