This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2018 at 07:00:32 (UTC).

PUBG Corporation et al v. NetEase, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 PUBG Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against NetEase, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02010

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PUBG Corporation

PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.

Defendants

NetEase Information Technology Corporation

NetEase, Inc.

NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited

Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven S. Baik, Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building 1

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Ketan Vinodkumar Patel

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Ave.

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Francis LaFond

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94043

Claude M. Stern

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Evette Dionna Pennypacker

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065-2139

Mark Yeh-Kai Tung

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #33 Stipulation Regarding Second Amended Complaint, Dismissal of NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited, and Setting Time for NetEase Defendants to Respond to the Complaint filed by Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited, NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Second Amended Complaint, Dismissal of NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited, and Setting Time for NetEase Defendants to Respond to the Complaint filed by Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited, NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 5/24/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc., Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited. Filed byPUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 5/24/2018) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) Extending Time for NetEase Information Technology Corporation to Respond to the Operative Complaint filed by NetEase Information Technology Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc., PUBG Corporation. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Declaration of Cynthia Lenahan for Plaintiffs PUBG Corporation and PUBG Santa Monica Inc.'s Request to the Clerk to Perfect Service on Defendant Netease, Inc. filed by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Declaration of Cynthia Lenahan for Plaintiffs PUBG Corporation and PUBG Santa Monica Inc.'s Request to the Clerk to Perfect Service on Defendant Netease (Hong Kong) Limited filed by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. NetEase Information Technology Corporation served on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Patel, Ketan) (Filed on 4/24/2018) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Request to the Clerk to Perfect Service on Defendant NetEase, Inc. by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. (Patel, Ketan) (Filed on 4/24/2018) Modified on 4/25/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Request to the Clerk to Perfect Service on Defendant NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited by PUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. (Patel, Ketan) (Filed on 4/24/2018) Modified on 4/25/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Certificate of Interested Entities by NetEase Information Technology Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited for NetEase Information Technology Corporation. (Pennypacker, Evette) (Filed on 4/17/2018) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc., NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited. Filed byPUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/10/2018) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #8*** REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (cc: form mailed to register). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) Modified on 4/3/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PUBG Corporation, Other Affiliate Bluehole Studio Inc. for PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by PUBG Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bluehole Studio Inc., Other Affiliate PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. for PUBG Corporation. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12240221.). Filed byPUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETEASE INC. is a litigant