Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:30:41 (UTC).

(PS) Lorretz et al v. California@GALoan450D002 et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 PS Lorretz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California GALoan450D002. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carolyn K. Delaney and John A. Mendez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02666

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz

Sacramento, CA 95812

Joel Dennis Wallach

Turuche Lorretz

Defendants

California@GALoan450D002

California@GALoanChristopherGrimmettGA020

California@GALoanGATE010

California@GALoan4SOD002

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) MOTION to Add Another Five Pages Already Demurred by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#28

(#28) MOTION Plaintiffs to Appear in Court by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#27

(#27) MOTION to Set Calendar Date to Re-Open Case by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#26

(#26) MOTION plaintiff complained to Ms. Eichorn by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Discuss with the Court by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#24

(#24) JUDGMENT dated *11/14/2018* pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/2018. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#23

(#23) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/2018 DENYING #10 Motion, ADOPTING #11 Findings and Recommendations in full, and DISMISSING this action for lack of jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#11

(#23) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/2018 DENYING #10 Motion, ADOPTING #11 Findings and Recommendations in full, and DISMISSING this action for lack of jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#10

(#23) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/2018 DENYING #10 Motion, ADOPTING #11 Findings and Recommendations in full, and DISMISSING this action for lack of jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#8

(#8) PLAINTIFF MOTION to Ex Parte Set this Case for Hearing by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#7

(#7) Tho the plaintiff is a target of Kushners motion to add these nine pages by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION to meet with the judges by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz.(Kastilahn, A) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/17/2018) (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Meet with Judges by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to add three pages of Defendant causing harm to all Plaintiffs by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/3/2018 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; no later than 10/17/2018, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Add Another Five Pages Already Demurred by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION Plaintiffs to Appear in Court by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION to Set Calendar Date to Re-Open Case by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION plaintiff complained to Ms. Eichorn by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION to Discuss with the Court by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #23 Order and #24 Judgment, served on Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) JUDGMENT dated *11/14/2018* pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/2018. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/2018 DENYING #10 Motion, ADOPTING #11 Findings and Recommendations in full, and DISMISSING this action for lack of jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to agree as to acceptable service by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to speak to Judges in court after both Judges were called by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Coll, A) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PLAINTIFF MOTION to Ex Parte Set this Case for Hearing by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Tho the plaintiff is a target of Kushners motion to add these nine pages by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to meet with the judges by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz.(Kastilahn, A) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/17/2018) (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Meet with Judges by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Huang, H) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/3/2018 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; no later than 10/17/2018, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to add three pages of Defendant causing harm to all Plaintiffs by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Diana Lee Wallach Lorretz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less