This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2018 at 07:03:52 (UTC).

PRx Performance, LLC v. Axom Acquisition Co., LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 PRx Performance, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Axom Acquisition Co , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05007

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRx Performance, LLC

Defendants

Axom Acquisition Co., LLC

Jason Howard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meredith K. Lowry

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

3333 South Pinnacle Hills Pkwy, #510

Rogers, AR 72758

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRx Performance, LLC. Jason Howard served on 1/24/2018, answer due 2/14/2018. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Axom Acquisition Co., LLC, Jason Howard, filed by PRx Performance, LLC.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C )(rg). (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Attorney Michael Neustel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1652188) by PRx Performance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael Neustel)(Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

6 #1

Affidavit Michael Neustel

#10

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A PATENT ACTION for a case initiated by PRx Performance, LLC with the filing of #1 Complaint. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

5 #1

Affidavit Edward Runyan

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by PRx Performance, LLC. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRx Performance, LLC. Axom Acquisition Co., LLC served on 1/29/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by PRx Performance, LLC . (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case/Party: re #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party/Case filed by PRx Performance, LLC (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). (rg) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by PRx Performance, LLC . (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRx Performance, LLC. Axom Acquisition Co., LLC served on 1/29/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRx Performance, LLC. Jason Howard served on 1/24/2018, answer due 2/14/2018. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Axom Acquisition Co., LLC, Jason Howard and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. EDWARD RUNYAN is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter; AND GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MICHAEL NEUSTEL is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 18, 2018. (slc) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jason Howard for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Axom Acquisition for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Attorney Michael Neustel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1652188) by PRx Performance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael Neustel)(Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Attorney Edward Runyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1652186) by PRx Performance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Edward Runyan)(Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1652172.. (Lowry, Meredith) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff PRx Performance, LLC. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Edward K. Runyan & Michael S. Neustel. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/22/2018 (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A PATENT ACTION for a case initiated by PRx Performance, LLC with the filing of #1 Complaint. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by PRx Performance, LLC. (rg) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Axom Acquisition Co., LLC, Jason Howard, filed by PRx Performance, LLC.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C )(rg). (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.