This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 21:01:21 (UTC).

Prospect East Holdings, Inc. et al v. United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Prospect East Holdings, Inc filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against United Nurses Allied Professionals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00671

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Prospect CharterCARE, LLC

Prospect East Holdings, Inc.

Prospect CharterCARE, LLC A Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Our Lady of Fatima Hospital

Defendant and Counter Claimant

United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Erika J. Lindberg

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002-6111

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Christopher Callaci

Attorney at United Nurse & Allied Professionals

375 Branch Avenue

Providence, RI 02904

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) JUDGMENT in favor of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. against Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #16 Motion for Summary Judgment - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/8/2019 (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

16 #6

Exhibit

16 #4

Exhibit

16 #3

Exhibit

16 #2

Exhibit

16 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#16

(#21) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#13

NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motions Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/17/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Our Lady of Fatima Hospital for Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc... (Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299478 ), filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) JUDGMENT in favor of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. against Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #16 Motion for Summary Judgment - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/8/2019 (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING CANCELLED: Notice of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment previously scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is here by CANCELLED. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREVISED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; PLEASE NOTE THE HEARING WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 1(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motions Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/17/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. re #19 Response to Motion, #23 Response to Motion, #21 Response to Motion (Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. re #21 Response to Motion. (Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE In Opposition to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Prospect East Holdings, Inc. re #19 Response to Motion,. (Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Callaci on behalf of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. (Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc..(Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Callaci on behalf of United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. (Callaci, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Our Lady of Fatima Hospital for Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc... (Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to United Nurses & Allied Professionals, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299478 ), filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299478 ), filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lindberg, Erika) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less