This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2021 at 23:11:02 (UTC).

Property Disclosure Technologies LLC v. Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2014 Property Disclosure Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John D. Love. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John D. Love

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Property Disclosure Technologies LLC

Defendants

Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC

Winans, Inc.

David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC

Counter Claimants and Consolidated Defendants

JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.

Keller Williams Reality, Inc.

Redfin Corporation

Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC

RE/MAX LLC

Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC

Century 21 Real Estate LLC

Weichert Co.

BRER Affiliates LLC

Zillow, Inc.

ERA Franchise Systems LLC

Not Classified By Court

William Joseph Cornelius

Tyler, TX 75711-7339

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian Andrew Carpenter

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Monica Nguyen Tavakoli

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark Davin Perantie

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP - Dallas

8150 North Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Christopher Michael Joe

Attorney at Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4750

Dallas, TX 75201

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Christopher B Welsh

Attorney at Stoddard & Welsh, PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Ste M1150

Dallas, TX 75206

Richard Basile

Attorney at St. Onge Steward Johnston & Reens, LLC

986 Bedford Street

Stamford, CT 06905

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

John M Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP - Dallas

2323 Ross Ave., Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew C Acosta

Attorney at Jackson Walker - Dallas

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202-4207

Counter Claimant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Laura Sanders Fowler

Attorney at The Fowler Law Firm, PC - Austin

919 Congress Avenue, Suite 900

Austin, TX 78701

Christopher B Welsh

Attorney at Stoddard & Welsh, PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Ste M1150

Dallas, TX 75206

M. Dru Montgomery

Attorney at The Heartfield Law Firm

2195 Dowlen Road

Beaumont, TX 77706

Natalie A. Bennett

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Brockius LLP - D.C.

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Richard Basile

Attorney at St. Onge Steward Johnston & Reens, LLC

986 Bedford Street

Stamford, CT 06905

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

Steven J Rocci

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP - Philadelphia

Cira Centre - 12Th Floor, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Henrik Davidson Parker

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC - Wilmington

1526 Gilpin Ave.

Wilmington, DE 19806

Ramy E Hanna

Attorney at Foley & Lardner - New York

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Matthew Paul Harper

Attorney at Harper IP Group, LLC

817 North Saddlebrook Drive

Bedford, TX 76021

Allen Franklin Gardner

Attorney at Allen Gardner Law, PLLC

609 South Fannin

Tyler, TX 75701

Ramsey M Al-Salam

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 Third Avenue, 40Th Fl

Seattle, WA 98101

Not Classified By Court Attorney

William Joseph Cornelius, Jr

Attorney at Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

One American Center, 909 Ese Loop 323, Suite 400, P.O. Box 7339

Tyler, TX 75711-7339

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#238

(#238) FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the causes of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the counterclaims DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/11/2015. (gsg) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

#237

(#237) ORDER granting in part #229 Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors Inc. Plaintiff's infringement claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant's counterclaims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant may file a motion seeking fees and/or costs related to this matter within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/21/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

#236

(#236) REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Reply to Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#235

(#235) NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #227 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Estimate of Time for Markman Hearing (Lesher, Barrett) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

234 #6

Exhibit F

234 #5

Exhibit E

229 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#229

(#233) RESPONSE to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welsh, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#227

(#235) NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #227 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Estimate of Time for Markman Hearing (Lesher, Barrett) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Davin Perantie on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Perantie, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,945,530

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,584,167

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4476934.), filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,584,167, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,945,530, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

418 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#238) FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the causes of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the counterclaims DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/11/2015. (gsg) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • NOTICE that the Markman Hearing set for Thursday, January 29, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. HAS BEEN CANCELLED. (mjm, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#237) ORDER granting in part #229 Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors Inc. Plaintiff's infringement claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant's counterclaims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant may file a motion seeking fees and/or costs related to this matter within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/21/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#236) REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Reply to Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#235) NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #227 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Estimate of Time for Markman Hearing (Lesher, Barrett) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#234) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Lesher, Barrett) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#233) RESPONSE to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welsh, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#232) ORDER granting #230 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/06/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#231) SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #186 First SEALED MOTION To Strike and For Sanctions PLAINTIFF PROPERTY DISCLOSURE TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#230) Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #219 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion for Sanctions by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 01/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 01/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Nguyen Tavakoli on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Tavakoli, Monica) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Davin Perantie on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Perantie, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4476934.), filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,584,167, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,945,530, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where . Winans is a litigant

Latest cases where ERA Franchise Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Property Disclosure Technologies LLC is a litigant