Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 13:13:32 (UTC).

Price v. US Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 Price filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against US Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. Michael Price

Defendant

US Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael F. McGuinness

James A. Patten

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER denying 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM "Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P." filed by US Bank, N.A. and denying 18 MOTION To Excuse or Suspend Performance filed by R. Michael Price. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/25/2017. (EMH)

#27

(#27) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for June 30, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. and the deadlines for the related disclosures set forth in this Court's Order dated May 16, 2017, are hereby VACATED until such time that t he Court rules on 20 U.S. Bank's pending Motion to Dismiss. The Court will issue a new Order resetting those dates and deadlines as appropriate following its ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/23/2017. (EMH)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER denying 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM "Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P." filed by US Bank, N.A. and denying 18 MOTION To Excuse or Suspend Performance filed by R. Michael Price. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/25/2017. (EMH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for June 30, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. and the deadlines for the related disclosures set forth in this Court's Order dated May 16, 2017, are hereby VACATED until such time that t he Court rules on 20 U.S. Bank's pending Motion to Dismiss. The Court will issue a new Order resetting those dates and deadlines as appropriate following its ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/23/2017. (EMH)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael F. McGuinness

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A. Patten