This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:56:40 (UTC).

Price v. Scarborough et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Price filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Scarborough. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory M. Sleet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01056

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory M. Sleet

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Millard E. Price

Smyrna, DE 19977

Defendants

Deputy Warden Scarborough

Jane/John Doe

Marc Richman

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER, The plaintiffs complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the court's July 26, 2018 order (D.I. #4 ).. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/7/2018. (jcs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of the Court, a request to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/26/2018. (ceg) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Supplemental Letter - re #1 Complaint. (jcs) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Jane/John Doe, Marc Richman, Deputy Warden Scarborough - filed by Millard E. Price. (No Fee Paid, No IFP).(nmg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • CASE CLOSED (jcs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER, The plaintiffs complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the court's July 26, 2018 order (D.I. #4 ).. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/7/2018. (jcs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of the Court, a request to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/26/2018. (ceg) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental Letter - re #1 Complaint. (jcs) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Jane/John Doe, Marc Richman, Deputy Warden Scarborough - filed by Millard E. Price. (No Fee Paid, No IFP).(nmg) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.