This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 19:49:29 (UTC).

Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. v. Golf Solutions I, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 Prestige Flag Mfg Co , Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Golf Solutions I, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc.

Defendants

Golf Solutions I, LLC

Golf Solutions I, LLC A Wisconsin limited liability company d/b/a Laser Link Golf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Gill

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP

12275 El Camino Real, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Bradley C. Graveline

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 4800

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan Paul Sugar

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 W. Adams, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Maxwell James Petersen

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 W. Adams, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Thomas Sloan Kidde

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Pretrial Conference Order: Proof of Standing to sue on claimed patents due 5/11/2018. Preliminary Disclosure of Infringement Contentions due 8/15/2018. Preliminary Disclosure of Invalidity and Unenforceability Contentions due 9/14/2018. Amendments to the Pleadings due 7/31/2018. Dispositive Motions due 4/19/2019. Settlement Letters due 8/16/2019. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 9/13/2019. Responses due 10/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/13/2018. (arw) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

#15

(#15) Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in a Complex Civil Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/13/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

#14

(#14) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. re: #8 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Golf Solutions I, LLC. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#13

(#13) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#11

(#11) Motion to Admit Thomas Sloan Kidde Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2219380.) by Defendant Golf Solutions I, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kidde, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

#9

(#9) Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Discovery and Briefing Schedule by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Graveline, Bradley) Modified on 3/26/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - United States Design Patent, D526,930 S

#8

(#14) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. re: #8 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Golf Solutions I, LLC. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Maxwell James Petersen for Defendant Golf Solutions I, LLC. (Petersen, Maxwell) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#4

(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Golf Solutions I, LLC. (kwf) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#3) Notice by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Pretrial Conference Order: Proof of Standing to sue on claimed patents due 5/11/2018. Preliminary Disclosure of Infringement Contentions due 8/15/2018. Preliminary Disclosure of Invalidity and Unenforceability Contentions due 9/14/2018. Amendments to the Pleadings due 7/31/2018. Dispositive Motions due 4/19/2019. Settlement Letters due 8/16/2019. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 9/13/2019. Responses due 10/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/13/2018. (arw) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in a Complex Civil Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/13/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/10/2018 [:35] (cak) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. re: #8 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Golf Solutions I, LLC. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Thomas Sloan Kidde Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/30/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion to Admit Thomas Sloan Kidde Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2219380.) by Defendant Golf Solutions I, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kidde, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulation to stay discovery #9 is accepted by the court in this fashion: (1) the parties' extension of their briefing deadlines on the pending motion to dismiss is accepted; (2) the court still will hold the telephonic pretrial conference on April 10, 2018, and the parties must file a timely Rule 26(f) report; and (3) at the pretrial conference, the court will stay discovery until the court rules on the pending dismissal motion or until June 22, 2018, whichever comes first. The court will account for the discovery stay when setting the schedule for this case at the telephonic conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/27/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Discovery and Briefing Schedule by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Graveline, Bradley) Modified on 3/26/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Bryan Paul Sugar Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/9/2018. (lak) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to Admit Bryan Paul Sugar Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2206246.) by Defendant Golf Solutions I, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sugar, Bryan) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Maxwell James Petersen for Defendant Golf Solutions I, LLC. (Petersen, Maxwell) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice by Plaintiff Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent. (Graveline, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (kwf) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Golf Solutions I, LLC. (kwf) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against Golf Solutions I, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2191212.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,215,412, issued May 8, 2007, held by O'Loughlin et al.; Patent # D564,405, issued March 18, 2008, held by O'Loughlin et al.; Patent # D546,243, issued July 10, 2007, held by O'Loughlin et al., filed by Prestige Flag Mfg. Co., Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No.: US 7,215,412, #2 Exhibit B - Patent No.: US D564,405 #3 Exhibit C - Patent No.: US D546,243, #4 Exhibit D - Portions of Golf Solutions Website, #5 Summons) (Graveline, Bradley) (Exhibit descriptions and additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2018: #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet. (lak) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less