This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:48:20 (UTC).

Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. et al v. UR IN INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Premium Latin Publishing, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against UR IN INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-07385

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J&N Publishing LLC

Premium Latin Publishing, Inc.

Palabras De Romeo

J&N Publishing LLC doing business as Juan & Nelson Publishing

Defendants

Jairo A. Lopez

Chicago, IL 60625

UR IN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Tottis

Attorney at TottisLaw

1 East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60602

Monica L. Thompson

Attorney at TottisLaw

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court has received Defendant Lopez's answer #14 to Plaintiffs' complaint, in which he also requests a motion to dismiss. If Defendant would like to file a motion to dismiss, he may do so by filing a motion on the docket, accompanied by a memorandum of law in support of his motion. The Court notes that any motion to dismiss must be accompanied by a notice of presentment, in accordance with Local Rule 5.3 and this Court's standing orders. Any motion must be filed no later than the third business day before the day the motion is to be heard. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant's request for a motion to dismiss complaint Title 17 of the United States Code pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1338 by Jairo A. Lopez(pk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#13

(#13) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Jairo A. Lopez (pk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo as to UR IN INC. on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo as to Jairo A. Lopez on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#10

(#10) Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#7

(#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (pk, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. by Kevin Tottis Monica L. Thompson (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15155089.(Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court has received Defendant Lopez's answer #14 to Plaintiffs' complaint, in which he also requests a motion to dismiss. If Defendant would like to file a motion to dismiss, he may do so by filing a motion on the docket, accompanied by a memorandum of law in support of his motion. The Court notes that any motion to dismiss must be accompanied by a notice of presentment, in accordance with Local Rule 5.3 and this Court's standing orders. Any motion must be filed no later than the third business day before the day the motion is to be heard. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant's request for a motion to dismiss complaint Title 17 of the United States Code pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1338 by Jairo A. Lopez(pk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Jairo A. Lopez (pk, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo as to UR IN INC. on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo as to Jairo A. Lopez on 11/18/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jairo A. Lopez, UR IN INC. (acm) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (pk, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc. by Kevin Tottis Monica L. Thompson (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., J&N Publishing LLC, Palabras De Romeo; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15155089.(Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&N Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Tottis