This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:39 (UTC).

Prather v. Ga. Board of Pardons & Paroles, et al., et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Prather filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Ga Board of Pardons Paroles, . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04028

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny Isaiah Prather

Chester, GA 31012

Defendants

The State of Georgia

Ga. Board of Pardons & Paroles, et al.,

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the #1 Complaint should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/29/18. (jkl) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action. (jkl)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/10/18. (jkl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/29/18. (jkl) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Johnny Isaiah Prather. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for Johnny Isaiah Prather (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • Civil Case Terminated. (jkl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Johnny Isaiah Prather re #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jkl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action. (jkl)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/10/18. (jkl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkl) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for Johnny Isaiah Prather (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(btql) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Johnny Isaiah Prather re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jkl) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/29/18. (jkl) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the #1 Complaint should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/29/18. (jkl) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ddm) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Johnny Isaiah Prather. (ddm) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Johnny Isaiah Prather. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less