This case was last updated from PACER on 07/25/2017 at 02:20:04 (UTC).

Powell v. Dimas et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 Powell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Dimas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-04188

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harold Powell

Rushville, IL 62681

Defendants

Steve Gaskell

Christopher Clayton

John Sullivan

Kimberly Weitl

Joseph Hankins

Sharlene Carraway

David Suire

Shan Jumper

Lisa Madigan

John and Jane Does

Dave Bierman

Michael Bednarz

Anderson Freeman

Joelle Marasco

James Dimas

Michael Madigan

Greg Scott

Aramark Correctional Food Services

Richard Travis

5 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT by Harold Powell. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

#5

(#5) Letter from CDIL to Rushville, Attn: Trust Fund Department requesting trust fund ledgers. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold Powell. Responses due by 8/7/2017 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

3 #1

NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES.

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 8/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES.)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P 8(e) Instanter by Plaintiff Harold Powell. Responses due by 8/7/2017 (VH, ilcd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/24/2017) (VH, ilcd). (Entered: 07/24/2017)

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Harold Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT by Harold Powell. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from CDIL to Rushville, Attn: Trust Fund Department requesting trust fund ledgers. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold Powell. Responses due by 8/7/2017 (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 8/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES.)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P 8(e) Instanter by Plaintiff Harold Powell. Responses due by 8/7/2017 (VH, ilcd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/24/2017) (VH, ilcd). (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Harold Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(VH, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less