This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 08:08:09 (UTC).

Potter et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Potter filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Linda H. Potter

Hal C. Potter

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas David Noreen

Attorney at Howard, Stallings, From & Hutson P.A.

5410 Trinity Rd., Suite 210, P. O. Box 12347

Raleigh, NC 27605

Defendant Attorney

Kyle L. Bishop

Attorney at United States Department of Justice - Tax Division

Post Office Box 227, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 1/17/2019. It is further ORDERED that the associated deadlines contained in Rules 16 and 26 shall also be EXTENDED by 45 days. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/28/2018. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Attendant Deadlines in Rules 16 and 26 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bishop, Kyle) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#8

(#8) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter served on United States Attorney, United States of America c/o Attorney General and Internal Revenue Service on 10/11/2018; 10/15/2018. (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Service filed by Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter regarding #1 Complaint, . (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas David Noreen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Estate of Linda H. Potter (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #9

IRS Account Transcript

1 #8

IRS Response Letter to Jones

1 #7

Jones Letter to IRS

1 #6

IRS Response Letter to Potters

1 #5

Certified Mail Receipts

1 #4

2012 Amended Tax Return

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 90021G.), filed by HAL C. POTTER, ESTATE OF LINDA H. POTTER, by and through HAL C. POTTER, Executor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 2012 Amended Tax Return, #5 Certified Mail Receipts, #6 IRS Response Letter to Potters, #7 Jones Letter to IRS, #8 IRS Response Letter to Jones, #9 IRS Account Transcript) (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 1/17/2019. It is further ORDERED that the associated deadlines contained in Rules 16 and 26 shall also be EXTENDED by 45 days. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/28/2018. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Attendant Deadlines in Rules 16 and 26. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Attendant Deadlines in Rules 16 and 26 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bishop, Kyle) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter served on United States Attorney, United States of America c/o Attorney General and Internal Revenue Service on 10/11/2018; 10/15/2018. (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Service filed by Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter regarding #1 Complaint, . (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas David Noreen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Estate of Linda H. Potter (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Hal C. Potter (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summonses Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel is reminded to print summonses and effect service. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Case transferred in from Western Division on 10/05/2018. Old Case Number 5:18-cv-476. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as an Eastern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:18-CV-167-D. No further filing shall be made in 5:18-CV-476-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/5/2018. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Eastern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL067254. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 90021G.), filed by HAL C. POTTER, ESTATE OF LINDA H. POTTER, by and through HAL C. POTTER, Executor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 2012 Amended Tax Return, #5 Certified Mail Receipts, #6 IRS Response Letter to Potters, #7 Jones Letter to IRS, #8 IRS Response Letter to Jones, #9 IRS Account Transcript) (Noreen, Douglas) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less