This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:57:33 (UTC).

PopSockets LLC v. DozTrading LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 PopSockets LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DozTrading LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00588

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PopSockets LLC

Defendants

Mehmet Doz

DozTrading LLC

DozCell LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Lynn Gregor

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn S.C.

One East Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 2719

Madison, WI 53701-2719

Benjamin T Horton

Attorney at Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, 6300 Sears Tower

Chicago, IL 60606

Michelle Bolos

Attorney at Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, 6300 Sears Tower

Chicago, IL 60606

David N. Patariu

Attorney at Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, 6300 Willis Tower

Chicago, IL 60606

Benjamin T. Horton

Attorney at Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, 6300 Sears Tower

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#2) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit Benjamin T. Horton Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

3 #10

Summons to Mehmet Doz

3 #8

Summons to DozTrading LLC

3 #11

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order - Entry of Default

3 #5

Exhibit E - Copyright Registrations

#17

(#17) Declaration of Michelle Bolos filed by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC re: #16 Motion for Entry of Default. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#13

(#13) Declaration of Michelle Bolos filed by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC re: #11 Motion for Default Judgment, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Printouts of Mehmet Doz's Social Media Accounts, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Notifications and Intellectual Property Infringement Notifications, #3 Exhibit C - DFI Search Results for DozCell LLC and DozTrading LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Pages from DozTrading's Website, #5 Exhibit E - TSDR Search Results) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit A - USPN 8560031

#3

(#3) PATENT COMPLAINT against Mehmet Doz, DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2287781.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8560031, issued 10/15/2013, held by PopSockets LLC; Patent # D777,022, issued 1/24/2017, held by PopSockets LLC; Patent # D818,808, issued 5/29/2018, held by PopSockets LLC; filed by PopSockets LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 8560031, #2 Exhibit B - USPN D777022, #3 Exhibit C - USPN D818808, #4 Exhibit D - PopSockets Works of Art, #5 Exhibit E - Copyright Registrations, #6 Exhibit F - Trademark Registrations, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to DozTrading LLC, #9 Summons to DozCell LLC, #10 Summons to Mehmet Doz, #11 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

3 #6

Exhibit F - Trademark Registrations

#16

(#16) Motion for Entry of Default as to DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Entry of Default) (Gregor, Jennifer) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

13 #1

Exhibit A - Printouts of Mehmet Doz's Social Media Accounts

3 #2

Exhibit B - USPN D777022

13 #2

Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Notifications and Intellectual Property Infringemen

#19

(#19) Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC. (kwf) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#18

(#18) Certificate of Service by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC as to #16 Motion for Entry of Default as to DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC, #17 Declaration. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#15

(#15) Disregard. To be refiled. Modified on 9/18/2018 (voc). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • Set Hearing: Default Hearing set for 10/24/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 250 before District Judge William M. Conley. (kwf) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service as to defendant Mehmet Doz. (kwf) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC. (kwf) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Certificate of Service by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC as to #16 Motion for Entry of Default as to DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC, #17 Declaration. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Declaration of Michelle Bolos filed by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC re: #16 Motion for Entry of Default. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Motion for Entry of Default as to DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Entry of Default) (Gregor, Jennifer) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Disregard. To be refiled. Modified on 9/18/2018 (voc). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Service by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC as to #13 Declaration, #12 Brief in Support, #11 Motion for Default Judgment as to DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Declaration of Michelle Bolos filed by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC re: #11 Motion for Default Judgment, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Printouts of Mehmet Doz's Social Media Accounts, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Notifications and Intellectual Property Infringement Notifications, #3 Exhibit C - DFI Search Results for DozCell LLC and DozTrading LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Pages from DozTrading's Website, #5 Exhibit E - TSDR Search Results) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Brief in Support of #11 Motion for Default Judgment and for a Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance filed by David N. Patariu for Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Patariu, David) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Bolos for Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Bolos, Michelle) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to DozTrading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to DozCell LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Mehmet Doz) (kwf) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PATENT COMPLAINT against Mehmet Doz, DozCell LLC, DozTrading LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2287781.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8560031, issued 10/15/2013, held by PopSockets LLC; Patent # D777,022, issued 1/24/2017, held by PopSockets LLC; Patent # D818,808, issued 5/29/2018, held by PopSockets LLC; filed by PopSockets LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 8560031, #2 Exhibit B - USPN D777022, #3 Exhibit C - USPN D818808, #4 Exhibit D - PopSockets Works of Art, #5 Exhibit E - Copyright Registrations, #6 Exhibit F - Trademark Registrations, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to DozTrading LLC, #9 Summons to DozCell LLC, #10 Summons to Mehmet Doz, #11 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit Benjamin T. Horton Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Motion to Admit Benjamin T. Horton Pro Hac Vice, ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2287757.) by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Horton, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.