This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:33:43 (UTC).

Poitevent et al v. Dautel et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Poitevent filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dautel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Joan N. Ericksen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-02320

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Joan N. Ericksen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul J. Poitevent

Judith A. Poitevent

Defendants

Scott E. Michel

State of Minnesota

Alfred F. Michael, Jr.

Cook County and the State of Minnesota in trust for the local taxing districts

Susan M. Fuller

United States of America

Kathie Comer Michel

Martha L. Dautel

also all heirs and devisees of any of the above-named persons who are deceased, and other persons or parties unknown, claiming any right, title, estate, lien or interest in the real property described

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan W Leaf

Attorney at Jonathan W Leaf, PA

5101 Thimsen Ave, Inactive

Minnetonka, MN 55345

Defendant Attorney

Roylene A Champeaux

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 S 4Th St Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

5 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/10/2018. (VLM) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#6

(#6) Declaration of Roylene A. Champeaux in Support of #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America.(Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER on #9 Stipulation Between Plaintiffs Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent and Defendant United States of America for Remand to State Court. This case is hereby REMANDED to Cook County District Court, State of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/13/2018. (CBC) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (LEG). (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cook County District Court, case number 16-CV-17-47 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Petition, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Summons and Petition

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America.(Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS PAUL J. POITEVENT AND JUDITH A. POITEVENT AND DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent. (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#12

(#12) LETTER from United States District Court, Clerk's Office to Cook County District Court re: Order of Remand. (MMP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation,. (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER from United States District Court, Clerk's Office to Cook County District Court re: Order of Remand. (MMP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER on #9 Stipulation Between Plaintiffs Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent and Defendant United States of America for Remand to State Court. This case is hereby REMANDED to Cook County District Court, State of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/13/2018. (CBC) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (LEG). (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation,. (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS PAUL J. POITEVENT AND JUDITH A. POITEVENT AND DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Paul J. Poitevent and Judith A. Poitevent. (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/10/2018. (VLM) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America.(Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration of Roylene A. Champeaux in Support of #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America.(Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 5th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18cv2320 JNE/LIB. (AKL) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cook County District Court, case number 16-CV-17-47 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Petition, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Champeaux, Roylene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.