This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 17:52:09 (UTC).

Poirier v. Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Poirier filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00648

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Ann Poirier

Defendants

Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC

Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC doing business as Landmark Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas E. Sparks

Attorney at Law Ofifces of Thomas E. Sparks

285 Main Street, Suite 7

Woonsocket, RI 02895

Defendant Attorneys

Sheri L. Pizzi

Attorney at Barton Gilman LLP

10 Dorrance St., 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Mark R. Fleury

Attorney at Barton Gilman LLP

10 Dorrance Street, Suite 800

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER remanding this case to the Providence County Superior Court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#4

(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. for Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri L. Pizzi on behalf of Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-7770. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1293456, filed by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleury, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/30/2018) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER remanding this case to the Providence County Superior Court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 1/15/2019; Jack Mycroft and Mark Fleury participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. for Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri L. Pizzi on behalf of Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-7770. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1293456, filed by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleury, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/30/2018) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prime Healthcare Foundation, Inc. for Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri L. Pizzi on behalf of Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-7770. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1293456, filed by Prime Healthcare Services - Landmark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleury, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/30/2018) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Simoncelli, Michael). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less