This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:36:38 (UTC).

Pluta et al v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Pluta filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00328

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Walter Pluta

Patricia Pluta

Defendants

Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary E Brewer

Attorney at Brewer & Terry, PC

1702 West Andrew Johnson Highway

Morristown, TN 37816-2046

Thomas C Jessee

Attorney at Jessee & Jessee

P O Box 997

Johnson City, TN 37605

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew David Tharp

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

Kenneth P Conour

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SUPPLEMENT to #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) Certificate of Good Standing for Ken Conour by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766319.) and #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) **Note to Attorney: #12 and #13 are duplicate documents and both have state certificates attached, not required district court certificate as required. A copy of this deficiency notice has been sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Conour. (MDG) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

13 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#13

(#13) Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

12 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766319.) by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Motions due by 7/23/2019.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/13/2018. (MRE, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

7 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#7

(#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc..(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUPPLEMENT to #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) Certificate of Good Standing for Ken Conour by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766319.) and #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) **Note to Attorney: #12 and #13 are duplicate documents and both have state certificates attached, not required district court certificate as required. A copy of this deficiency notice has been sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Conour. (MDG) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. as to Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (MDG) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766329.) by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth P. Conour ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3766319.) by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Motions due by 7/23/2019.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/13/2018. (MRE, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/10/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc..(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 3-236-18. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740172), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Complaint from State Court, #3 Other Summons for Johnson & Johnson)(Tharp, Andrew) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less