This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2019 at 08:00:53 (UTC).

Pluecker et al v. Paxton et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Pluecker filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Paxton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01100

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Pluecker

Zachary Abdelhadi

George Hale

Obinna Dennar

Defendants

Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System

Board of Regents of the University of Houston System

Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District

Ken Paxton

Trustees of the Klein Independent School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Paul Clancy

Attorney at ACLU of Texas

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Edgar Saldivar

Attorney at ACLU of Texas

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Adriana Cecilia Pinon

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Texas

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Andre I. Segura

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Brian M. Hauss

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, INc.

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Vera Eidelman

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case No. 1:18-cv-1091-RP, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Pluecker et al. v. Paxton et al., Case No. 1:18-cv-1100-RP. Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al., Case No. 1:18-CV-1091-RP, is DESIGNATED as the lead case, and all further filings should be made in that cause number. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

14 #7

Proposed Order

14 #6

Declaration of John Pluecker

14 #5

Declaration of George Hale

14 #4

Declaration of Obinna Dennar

14 #3

Declaration of Zachary Abdelhadi

14 #2

Declaration of Christopher Clay

14 #1

Memo in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Declaration of Christopher Clay, #3 Declaration of Zachary Abdelhadi, #4 Declaration of Obinna Dennar, #5 Declaration of George Hale, #6 Declaration of John Pluecker, #7 Proposed Order)(lt) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

13 #9

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction

13 #8

Affidavit of John Pluecker In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

13 #7

Affidavit of George Hale In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

13 #6

Affidavit of Obinna Dennar In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

13 #5

Affidavit of Zachary Abdelhadi In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

13 #3

Memo in Support of Preliminary Injunction

13 #2

Exhibit Motion for Preliminary Injunction

13 #1

Proposed Order for Motion for Overlength Brief

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion for Overlength Brief, #2 Exhibit Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memo in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #4 Affidavit of Christopher Clay In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Affidavit of Zachary Abdelhadi In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Affidavit of Obinna Dennar In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Affidavit of George Hale In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Affidavit of John Pluecker In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • All future pleadings should be filed in 1:18-cv-1091-RP (Lead Case). PLEASE DO NOT file any further pleadings in this case. (lt) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case No. 1:18-cv-1091-RP, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Pluecker et al. v. Paxton et al., Case No. 1:18-cv-1100-RP. Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al., Case No. 1:18-CV-1091-RP, is DESIGNATED as the lead case, and all further filings should be made in that cause number. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Declaration of Christopher Clay, #3 Declaration of Zachary Abdelhadi, #4 Declaration of Obinna Dennar, #5 Declaration of George Hale, #6 Declaration of John Pluecker, #7 Proposed Order)(lt) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #13 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion for Overlength Brief, #2 Exhibit Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memo in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #4 Affidavit of Christopher Clay In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Affidavit of Zachary Abdelhadi In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Affidavit of Obinna Dennar In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Affidavit of George Hale In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Affidavit of John Pluecker In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Brian M. Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker as to Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Board of Regents of the University of Houston System. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Ken Paxton. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver, #2 Waiver)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edgar Saldivar for Brian Hauss ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11595436) by on behalf of Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, Ken Paxton, Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (lt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Andre Ivan Segura to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Vera Eidelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Case and Forthcoming Motion Practice by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edgar Saldivar for Andre Ivan Segura ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11579671) by on behalf of Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edgar Saldivar for Vera Eidelman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11576236) by on behalf of Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Pro Hac Vice Letters to Andre Segura, Brian Hauss, Vera Eidelman and Kevin Dubose. (afd) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11568301). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Board of Regents of the University of Houston System is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas P Clancy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adriana Cecilia Pinon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Matthew Hauss