This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2018 at 05:09:00 (UTC).

Plexus Corp v. Hitachi Chemical Co, Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 Plexus Corp filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hitachi Chemical Co, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02904

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plexus Corp.

Defendants

Hitachi Chemical Co. Ltd.

Nissei Electric Co. Ltd.

Hitachi Chemical Co. America, LTD.

Taitsu America, Inc.

Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd.

Soshin Electronics of America Inc.

Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.

Hitachi AIC Inc.

Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc.

Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd.

Shinyei Kaisha

Soshin Electric Co., Ltd.

Taitsu Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda R Jesteadt,

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt PA

525 Okeechobee Blvd, Suite 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

David B Esau

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt PA

525 Okeechobee Blvd - Ste 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Kristin Alexandra Gore

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt PA

525 Okeechobee Blvd., Suite 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Aaron Stenzler Weiss

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt PA

100 Se 2Nd St - Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Bonnie Lau

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

William M. Gantz

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

#7

#6

#5

#2

1 #14

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00307. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Hitachi AIC Inc, Hitachi Chemical Co America Ltd, Hitachi Chemical Co Ltd, Matsuo Electric Co Ltd, Shinyei Capacitor Co Ltd, Shinyei Corporation of America Inc, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co Ltd, Soshin Electric Co Ltd, Soshin Electronics of America Inc, Taitsu America Inc, Taitsu Corporation. (Gantz, William) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by Matsuo Electric Co Ltd. (Gantz, William) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William Mitchell Gantz on behalf of Matsuo Electric Co Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: William Gantz (Gantz, William) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A Gore on behalf of Plexus Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Kristin A. Gore (Gore, Kristin) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cav) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, and the party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Plexus Corp. (Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Plexus Corp. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2779551) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plexus Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc. is a litigant