This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 14:09:10 (UTC).

Plaintiff Doctor v. Hospital Service District No 3 et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 Plaintiff Doctor filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hospital Service District No 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel E. Knowles, III and Barry W Ashe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07945

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Knowles, III

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plaintiff Doctor

Defendants

Greg Stock

Hospital Service District No 3

The Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center

The Board of Commissioners of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center

The Credentials Committee of TRMC

Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center

Board of Commissioners

Credentials Committee

Hospital Service District No 3 Parish of LaFourche doing business as Thibodaux Regional Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R.C. Riess

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70170-3300

Thomas Patrick Henican

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70170-3300

Christopher H. Riviere

Attorney at Riviere Law Firm

103 West Third St.

Thibodaux, LA 70301

Todd M. Magee

Attorney at Riviere Law Firm

103 West Third St.

Thibodaux, LA 70301

Defendant Attorneys

Dowling Burke Stough

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Jeremy T. Grabill

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

James P. Waldron

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Carl Edward Hellmers, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Christopher K. Ralston

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#15

8 #3

Summons

8 #2

Summons

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to set status conference by Plaintiff Doctor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riess, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents a defendant in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/5/2018.(mmv) (NEF: J. Ashe, MJ Knowles, Case Mgr) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock; answer due 10/25/2018. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/4/148. (clc) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Board of Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Credentials Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Hospital Service District No 3(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Greg Stock(pty:dft).(Ralston, Christopher) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Board of Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Credentials Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Hospital Service District No 3(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Greg Stock(pty:dft).(Ralston, Christopher) Modified on 10/3/2018 (clc). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Credentials Committee served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Greg Stock served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Board of Commissioners served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hospital Service District No 3 served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Riess, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/10/2018.(ajn) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 Summons Submitted for Issuance. ***Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of all Summons requests. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format.Clerk has taken corrective action.*** (ajn) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Board of Commissioners, Credentials Committee, Hospital Service District No 3, Medical Executive Committee of the Medical Staff of Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Greg Stock. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ajn) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Riess, Michael) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/10/2018) (ajn). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7070414) filed by Plaintiff Doctor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Michael R.C. Riess added to party Plaintiff Doctor(pty:pla).(Riess, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospital Service District No 3 is a litigant

Latest cases where BOARD OF CO COMMISSIONERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R.C. Riess

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Patrick Henican