This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 16:13:12 (UTC).

Pirtle et al v. Janssen Research & Development, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 Pirtle filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Janssen Research Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-10814

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evelyn Forester

LeRoy Pirtle

Defendants

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Janssen Ortho LLC

Janssen Research & Development LLC

Bayer AG

Bayer HealthCare AG

Bayer Pharma AG

Bayer Corporation

Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John J. Driscoll

Attorney at Driscoll Firm, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Eric D. Jackstadt

Attorney at Driscoll Firm, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Christopher J. Quinn

Attorney at The Driscoll Firm, PC

211 North Broadway, Ste. 4050

St. Louis, MO 63012

Defendant Attorneys

W. Jason Rankin

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM

211 North Broadway, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63102

Terry Lueckenhoff

Attorney at Fox Galvin, LLC

One S. Memorial Drive, 12Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

Bart C Sullivan

Attorney at Fox Galvin, LLC

One South Memorial Drive, 12Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

34 #1

*Restricted*

#34

(#34) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00755. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (jls) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

33 #1

Transmittal Letter

#33

(#33) TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2592) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to USDC, Eastern District of Louisiana.(Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(lmb) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 10/23/2017)

#32

(#32) PRELIMINARY TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2592) (kls3) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

#30

(#30) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #16 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #18 Motion to Stay. Bayer defendants' joinder to Janssen defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is granted. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/22/2017. (kmb2) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#18

(#30) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #16 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #18 Motion to Stay. Bayer defendants' joinder to Janssen defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is granted. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/22/2017. (kmb2) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#14

(#30) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #16 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #18 Motion to Stay. Bayer defendants' joinder to Janssen defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is granted. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/22/2017. (kmb2) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#11

(#30) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #16 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #18 Motion to Stay. Bayer defendants' joinder to Janssen defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is granted. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/22/2017. (kmb2) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit M - Transfer Order #743

1 #12

Exhibit L - Transfer Order #694

1 #11

Exhibit K - Transfer Order #447

1 #4

Exhibit D - J&J Writ Order

1 #3

Exhibit C - Imerys Writ Order

1 #2

Exhibit B - Jordan Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Second Notice of Removal from St. Clair County, case number 17-L-127 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3299276), filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Jordan Order, #3 Exhibit C - Imerys Writ Order, #4 Exhibit D - J&J Writ Order, #5 Exhibit E - Pre-Trial Order No. 11, #6 Exhibit F - Redmond Order, #7 Exhibit G - Glenn Order, #8 Exhibit H - Mory Order, #9 Exhibit I - Barba Order, #10 Exhibit J - Nash Order, #11 Exhibit K - Transfer Order #447, #12 Exhibit L - Transfer Order #694, #13 Exhibit M - Transfer Order #743, #14 Exhibit N - Transfer Order #1183, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00755. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (jls) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2592) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to USDC, Eastern District of Louisiana.(Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(lmb) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) PRELIMINARY TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2592) (kls3) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER at #30 is amended as follows: the Motion to Stay #18 is DENIED. (The effect of the amendment is to remove the qualifier "as moot." The JPML meets next week and no reason exists to stay the proceedings as to the remaining plaintiff. The motion is moot as to the dismissed plaintiffs). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/22/2017. (kmb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #16 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #18 Motion to Stay. Bayer defendants' joinder to Janssen defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is granted. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/22/2017. (kmb2) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC re 28 Order on Motion for Leave to File, -- Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jinright Order)(Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File. The Court DIRECTS defendants to file supplemental authority instanter. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/31/2017. (kmb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Leave to File - Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Remand by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC re 25 Order on Motion for Leave to File -- Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Covington Order)(Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants shall file the supplemental authority instanter. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/30/2017. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Second MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/28/2017 (Jackstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Jackstadt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Lueckenhoff on behalf of Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (Lueckenhoff, Terry) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent OMJ PR Holdings for Janssen Ortho LLC; Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent Centocor Research & Development, Inc. for Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Bart C. Sullivan on behalf of Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Second Notice of Removal from St. Clair County, case number 17-L-127 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3299276), filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Jordan Order, #3 Exhibit C - Imerys Writ Order, #4 Exhibit D - J&J Writ Order, #5 Exhibit E - Pre-Trial Order No. 11, #6 Exhibit F - Redmond Order, #7 Exhibit G - Glenn Order, #8 Exhibit H - Mory Order, #9 Exhibit I - Barba Order, #10 Exhibit J - Nash Order, #11 Exhibit K - Transfer Order #447, #12 Exhibit L - Transfer Order #694, #13 Exhibit M - Transfer Order #743, #14 Exhibit N - Transfer Order #1183, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Bart) [Transferred from ilsd on 11/3/2017.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer AG is a litigant