This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 16:18:35 (UTC).

Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-46186

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan

Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan

Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard D Nix

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Henry D Hoss

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Brandon P Long

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Mark D. Spencer

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Henry D. Hoss

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Richard D. Nix

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Brandon P. Long

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon SpecGX LLC on 10/19/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#35

(#35) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Purdue Pharma L.P. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#34

(#34) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#33

(#33) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#32

(#32) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Noramco Inc on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#31

(#31) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Johnson & Johnson on 10/22/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#30

(#30) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#29

(#29) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Endo Health Solutions Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#28

(#28) Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt PLC. (P,R) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 10/19/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Watson Laboratories Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Richard D Nix on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nix, Richard) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon P Long on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Long, Brandon) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D Spencer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Henry D Hoss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoss, Henry) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc filed by Bios Companies Inc(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon SpecGX LLC on 10/19/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Purdue Pharma L.P. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Noramco Inc on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Johnson & Johnson on 10/22/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Endo Health Solutions Inc. on 10/18/2018, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt PLC. (P,R) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Allergan Finance, #2 Summons Allergan PLC, #3 Summons Mallinckrodt PLC)(Spencer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Purdue Pharma Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 10/19/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Watson Laboratories Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Richard D Nix on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nix, Richard) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon P Long on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Long, Brandon) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D Spencer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Henry D Hoss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoss, Henry) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Plaintiffs' Original Complaint and Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2788393. (Hoss, Henry) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc filed by Bios Companies Inc(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant