This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Pigues et al v. H & M International Transportation et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Pigues filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against H M International Transportation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02680

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Pigues

Tise Pigues

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Norfolk Southern Railway Company

H & M International Transportation

Jeremy K Scott

Technical Services International, Mi-Jack Products Inc.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

H & M International Transportation

Not Classified By Court

Donna L. Russell

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Britton Peel

P.O. Box 8

Millington, TN 38083

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Kenneth O. Cooper

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley & Napolitan

Brinkley Plaza, Suite 800, 80 Monroe Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Wayne Lindsey Robbins, Jr

Attorney at ROBBINS TRAVIS PLLC

2485 East Southlake Blvd., Suite 160

Southlake, TX 76092

Scott Charles Campbell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT C. CAMPBELL

6750 Popalr Avenue, Suite 412

Germantown, TN 38138

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Scott Charles Campbell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT C. CAMPBELL

6750 Popalr Avenue, Suite 412

Germantown, TN 38138

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial (5 days) set for 1/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#29

(#29) Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Robbins, Wayne) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#28

(#28) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/21/2018. (pab) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by H & M International Transportation.(Campbell, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#26

(#26) Summons Issued as to Technical Services International, Mi-Jack Products Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

25 #1

Summons

#25

(#25) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Technical Services International, Mi-Jack Products Inc., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Peel, David) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

23 #1

Summons Summons to be issued to New Defendant, TSI MJ

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Summons by David Britton Peel on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be issued to New Defendant, TSI MJ)(Peel, David) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#9

(#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 02:10 PM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by H & M International Transportation, Jeremy K Scott.(Campbell, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Charles Campbell on behalf of H & M International Transportation, Jeremy K Scott (Campbell, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth O. Cooper on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Cooper, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Norfolk Southern Railway Company from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003829-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2892135), filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial (5 days) set for 1/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Robbins, Wayne) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/21/2018. (pab) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • (#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2018. David Peel appeared for the Plaintiff. Scott Campbell appeared for H&M and Jeremy Scott. Lynn Roberts appeared for Norfolk Southern Railway Co. Plaintiff is now back at work. Plaintiff filed a new Compliant adding TSI (the company who supplied and did maintenance to the cable.) Norfolk will non-suite the case against H&M International Transportation. the Court set scheduling dates. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial (5 days) set for 1/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Cathy Best) (mlk) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by H & M International Transportation.(Campbell, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Summons Issued as to Technical Services International, Mi-Jack Products Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Technical Services International, Mi-Jack Products Inc., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Peel, David) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #23 Notice of Summons filed by Eric Pigues, Tise Pigues has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer was granted permission to file an amended complaint adding an additional party, but counsel has not published the amended complaint and added the additional party. Clerk's office will issue new summons once the amended complaint has been published adding the additional party TSI MJ. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Summons by David Britton Peel on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be issued to New Defendant, TSI MJ)(Peel, David) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER Granting #21 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/15/2018. (pab) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against H & M International Transportation by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robbins, Wayne) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 02:10 PM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by H & M International Transportation, Jeremy K Scott.(Campbell, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Charles Campbell on behalf of H & M International Transportation, Jeremy K Scott (Campbell, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth O. Cooper on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Cooper, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Norfolk Southern Railway Company from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003829-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2892135), filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less