This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:21 (UTC).

Pierre v. Nielson

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Pierre filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Nielson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are B Janice Ellington and Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

B Janice Ellington

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronald Pierre

Robstown, TX 78380

Respondent

Kirstjen Nielson

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Clerk will transfer case to SDTX, Corpus Christi Division (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/29/2018) (chorace, 4). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to SDTX, Corpus Christi Division (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Stay Deportation. Motions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Ronald Pierre, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2018. (ltrevino, 3) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Pierre re: #6 Notice of Deficient Pleading, filed. (jmarks, 2) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Ronald Pierre. Parties notified. Notice of Compliance due by 10/15/2018, filed. (jmarks, 2) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Ronald Pierre re: address change. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope) (yhausmann, 6) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Case transferred in from Houston Division on 08/27/2018 ; Case Number 4:18-cv-2944. Case assigned to Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. filed by Ronald Pierre.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Intradistrict Transfer to SDTX, Corpus Christi Division filed. (rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to SDTX, Corpus Christi Division (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Clerk will transfer case to SDTX, Corpus Christi Division (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/29/2018) (chorace, 4). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Ronald Pierre.(dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.