This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:18 (UTC).

Pierga et al v. Merck & Co, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Pierga filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Merck Co, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01395

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sally Boon

Patricia Corrao

Kathy Silva

Philip Digregorio

Michele Merrick

Rickey Schmidt

Patricia Frazier

Felip Zielinski

Jean Wright

Patricia Pierga

Linda Odess

Florence Robinson

Ernest Koch

Robert J. Coffey

Teresa Brumbaugh

Alicia D. Colon

Alfred Berry

Defendants

McKesson Corp,

Merck & Co, Inc.

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carmen A. DeGisi

Attorney at Marc J. Bern & Partners LLP

101 W. Elm Street, Ste. 215

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Defendant Attorneys

Brett J. Preston

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd - Ste 3700, Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Carolina Yvonne Blanco

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd - Ste 3700, Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33602-5195

Edward W. Gerecke

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000, Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601-3239

David J. Walz

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000, Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601-3239

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2018-CA-008299 filed in State Court on 07/31/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL076272 filed by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(JP) Modified on 8/28/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 1

15 #1

Email

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #9 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; granting #11 DEFENDANTS MERCK & CO., INC. AND MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.'S UNOPPOSED SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Clerk is directed to STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case until there is a dispositive ruling as to whether this case will be transferred to In re: Zostavax (Zoster Vaccine Live) Products Liability Litigation, Case Number: MDL No. 2848. The parties shall immediately inform the Court when such dispositive ruling has been made. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/11/2018. (MB) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolina Yvonne Blanco on behalf of McKesson Corp, (Blanco, Carolina) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

12 #1

Supplement

#12

(#12) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File our Response to the Order to Show Cause by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Gerecke, Edward) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of consent to join by McKesson Corp, re #1 Notice of Removal. (JP) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

12 #3

Supplement

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to show cause by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Gerecke, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER to show cause why their claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(2) should not be dismissed or disregarded due to deficient citizenship allegations. as to Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2018. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/27/2018. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#15

(#15) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Eastern District of Pennsylvania MDL case number: 2484. CTO -4. (Attachments: #1 Email) (LMM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #4 Order to show cause on Plaintiffs' Citizenship by Alfred Berry, Sally Boon, Teresa Brumbaugh, Robert J. Coffey, Alicia D. Colon, Patricia Corrao, Philip Digregorio, Patricia Frazier, Ernest Koch, Michele Merrick, Linda Odess, Patricia Pierga, Florence Robinson, Rickey Schmidt, Kathy Silva, Jean Wright, Felip Zielinski. (DeGisi, Carmen) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

12 #2

Supplement

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to stay and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Gerecke, Edward) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Preston on behalf of McKesson Corp, (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#13

(#13) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/7/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • (#16) Case transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:18-cv-20092, filed 09/17/2018. (MAA) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Eastern District of Pennsylvania MDL case number: 2484. CTO -4. (Attachments: #1 Email) (LMM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #9 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; granting #11 DEFENDANTS MERCK & CO., INC. AND MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.'S UNOPPOSED SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Clerk is directed to STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case until there is a dispositive ruling as to whether this case will be transferred to In re: Zostavax (Zoster Vaccine Live) Products Liability Litigation, Case Number: MDL No. 2848. The parties shall immediately inform the Court when such dispositive ruling has been made. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/11/2018. (MB) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/7/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to show cause by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Gerecke, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2018 (LMM) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. New deadline: September 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2018. (PKK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION to stay and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Gerecke, Edward) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File our Response to the Order to Show Cause by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Gerecke, Edward) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re #4 Order to show cause on Plaintiffs' Citizenship by Alfred Berry, Sally Boon, Teresa Brumbaugh, Robert J. Coffey, Alicia D. Colon, Patricia Corrao, Philip Digregorio, Patricia Frazier, Ernest Koch, Michele Merrick, Linda Odess, Patricia Pierga, Florence Robinson, Rickey Schmidt, Kathy Silva, Jean Wright, Felip Zielinski. (DeGisi, Carmen) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Preston on behalf of McKesson Corp, (Preston, Brett) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolina Yvonne Blanco on behalf of McKesson Corp, (Blanco, Carolina) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER to show cause why their claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(2) should not be dismissed or disregarded due to deficient citizenship allegations. as to Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2018. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/27/2018. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of consent to join by McKesson Corp, re #1 Notice of Removal. (JP) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed in Orange County Court on 07/31/18.(JP) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 2018-CA-008299 filed in State Court on 07/31/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL076272 filed by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(JP) Modified on 8/28/2018 (LMM). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.