This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2019 at 07:25:40 (UTC).

Pierce v. Encore Health Resources, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Pierce filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Encore Health Resources, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04736

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Pierce

Defendant

Encore Health Resources, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan F. Stephan

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

205 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 2560

Chicago, IL 60601

Andrew Christopher Ficzko

Attorney at Stephan Zouras LLP

100 N Riverside Plaza, Ste 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Joshua David Buck

Attorney at Thierman Buck, LLP

7287 Lakeside Drive

Reno, NV 89511

James Zouras

Attorney at STEPHAN ZOURAS, LLP

205 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 2560

Chicago, IL 60601

Mark R. Thierman

Attorney at Thierman Buck, LLP .

7287 Lakeside Drive

Reno, NV 89511

Catherine Mitchell

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric M. Epstein

Attorney at Eric M. Epstein, APC

1901 Ave. Of The Stars, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ryan Stephan

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

100 N Riverside Plaza, Ste 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

Kevin David Harlow

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Joy Gowoon Kim

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

JeeHyun Yoon

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Leila Nourani

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Damien Paul DeLaney

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Paul James Hall, Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

555 Mission Street, Suite 2500

San Francisco, CA 94105-2933

Allison Amie Reddoch

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1717 Main Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#62

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

56 #1

Proposed Order

#56

#55

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #3

Declaration of Christy Green ISO Notice of Removal

1 #2

Declaration of Christine Hutchison ISO Notice of Removal

1 #1

Declaration of Leila Nourani ISO Notice of Removal

#1

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER granting #59 Motion for Andrew C. Ficzko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) MOTION for Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Pierce, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) MOTION for Andrew C. Ficzko to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy Pierce, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) ORDER granting #56 Joint MOTION to Vacate #55 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, Deadlines terminated (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Encore Health Resources, LLC identifying Specialist Resources Global, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) Joint MOTION to Vacate #55 Order for Initial Conference - FORM by Encore Health Resources, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reddoch, Allison) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER granting #51 Motion for Kevin D. Harlow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER granting #50 Motion for Joy G. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Encore Health Resources, LLC.. (Nakabayashi, Shannon) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi (Nakabayashi, Shannon) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement d ue by 10/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Removed Complaint (see document #1 -1; page 29) filed by Encore Health Resources, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Encore Health Resources, LLC (Nourani, Leila) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Encore Health Resources, LLC (Nourani, Leila) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Encore Health Resources, LLC . (Nourani, Leila) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG18906387. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12496349). Filed byEncore Health Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leila Nourani ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Christine Hutchison ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Christy Green ISO Notice of Removal)(Nourani, Leila) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Encore Health Resources, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew C. Ficzko

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua D. Buck