This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2018 at 07:50:08 (UTC).

Phillips v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 Phillips filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julia Phillips

Defendants

State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc.

Shannon Reed

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Grunau

Attorney at Grunau Law Offices

235 High St., Suite 615

Morgantown, WV 26505

Defendant Attorneys

Tiffany R. Durst

Attorney at Pullin Fowler Flanagan Brown & Poe PLLC - Morgantown

2414 Cranberry Sq

Morgantown, WV 26508

Nathaniel D. Griffith

Attorney at Pullin Fowler Flanagan Brown & Poe PLLC - Morgantown

2414 Cranberry Sq

Morgantown, WV 26508

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER DISMISSING SHANNON REED: The Court DISMISSES the defendant Shannon Reed from this civil action without prejudice and ORDERS that she be terminated from the active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/9/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Consenting to Dismissal filed by Julia Phillips. (Grunau, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Regarding Filing Deadlines by Julia Phillips. (Grunau, David) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

6 #6

Letter to Clerk of Court

6 #5

Certification of State Court Record

6 #4

Remainder of state court record

6 #3

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court

6 #2

Service of Process

6 #1

Complaint

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Service of Process, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Remainder of State Court Record, #5 Certification of State Court Record, #6 Letter to Clerk of Court). (wrr) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shannon Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Shannon Reed. (Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc..(Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/22/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/21/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B-WVSOS Service of Process

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV, (case number 18-C-295), filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Shannon Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-WVSOS Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C-Summons, #4 Exhibit D-State Court docket sheet, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2649248. (wrr) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DISMISSING SHANNON REED: The Court DISMISSES the defendant Shannon Reed from this civil action without prejudice and ORDERS that she be terminated from the active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/9/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Consenting to Dismissal filed by Julia Phillips. (Grunau, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION Regarding Filing Deadlines by Julia Phillips. (Grunau, David) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Service of Process, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Remainder of State Court Record, #5 Certification of State Court Record, #6 Letter to Clerk of Court). (wrr) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shannon Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Shannon Reed. (Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc..(Durst, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/22/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/21/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV, (case number 18-C-295), filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Shannon Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-WVSOS Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C-Summons, #4 Exhibit D-State Court docket sheet, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2649248. (wrr) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less