This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2018 at 08:06:33 (UTC).

Phillips-Berry v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Phillips-Berry filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo, Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr, Martin L.C. Feldman and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07890

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jane Triche Milazzo

Martin L.C. Feldman

Referral Judges

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shanta G. Phillips-Berry

Kenner, LA 70062

Defendants

U.S. States Military

Department of Justice of the State of Louisiana

Louisiana Department of Family Services

Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality

Lyft, LLC

Louisiana Office of Motor Vehicle

Louisiana Department of Justice

Louisiana Disciplinary Board Office of Disciplinary Counsel

Facebook

Enterprise Leasing Co.

Louisiana Housing Authority

Louisiana Department of Transportation

Hollydoow Productions

Uber

Louisiana Social Security Office

Louisiana Communication Service

Department of Transportation Department

Entergy of Louisiana

Donald J. Trump

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Marquest Meeks

Attorney at Entergy Services, Inc. (New Orleans)

639 Loyola Avenue, Suite 12A, P. O. Box 61000

New Orleans, LA 70113

Other Attorneys

Sean D. Moore

Attorney at Entergy Services, Inc. (New Orleans)

639 Loyola Avenue, Suite 12A, P. O. Box 61000

New Orleans, LA 70113

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

1 #14

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Housing Authority Louisiana served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (mm) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/3/2018. (clc) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . **Document contains incorrect Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section F and Magistrate Judge 5. In addition, the title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document.** (clc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hollywood Productions served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (sa) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Entergy of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Marquest Meeks added to party Entergy of Louisiana(pty:dft).(Meeks, Marquest) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF APPEAL by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry as to #16 Order Dismissing Case. (clc) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to U.S. States Military. (sa) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Enterprise Leasing Co. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (sa) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER - IT IS SO ORDERED: that Shanta Phillips-Berry's complaint is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that Ms. Phillips-Berry's motion to stop defendant attack is hereby DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that Ms. Phillips-Berry is hereby prohibited from filing anything else in this Court regarding her so-called claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that Ms. Phillips-Berry is prohibited from filing any additional complaints or bringing any other legal action in this Court that relate to a conspiracy by the defendants to engage in criminal acts and inflict pain upon her, or the insertion of a device controlled by the defendants. Failure to comply with this Order could result in sanctions, including contempt of Court. The Clerk of Court is ordered to provide this Court's Pro Se Office with a copy of this Order and shall not permit any further filings by Ms. Phillips-Berry. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/18/2018. (NEF: Pro Se)(cbs) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Entergy of Louisiana served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (sa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Facebook served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018; Lyft, LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return)(clc) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: ORDERED that Ms. Phillips-Berry must seek leave from this Court to file anything into the record. Continued submission of motions lacking any legal basis may result in a greater restriction of Ms. Phillips-Berry's ability to further pursue these claims. Ms. Phillips-Berry is invited to show cause as to why the Court should not restrict her ability to file into the record. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/7/2018.(clc) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Stop Defendant Attack by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry. (Attachment(s): #1 Proposed Order) (clc). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/29/2018.(clc)(NEF: MAG 1, MAG 5) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/28/2018.(caa) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - This matter is related to Civil Action No. 18-6037, previously allotted to Section "F", Magistrate Division (4) of this Court. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/27/2018. (NEF: Section F, Mag. 4)(sa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Department of Justice of the State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation Department, Entergy of Louisiana, Enterprise Leasing Co., Facebook, Hollywood Productions, Louisiana Communication Service, Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, Louisiana Department of Family Services, Louisiana Department of Justice, Louisiana Department of Transportation, Louisiana Disciplinary Board Office of Disciplinary Counsel, Louisiana Health and Hospitals Department, Louisiana Housing Authority, Louisiana Office of Motor Vehicle, Louisiana Social Security Office, Lyft, LLC, Donald J. Trump, U.S. States Military, Uber. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Pauper Letter) (Sms w/Pauper Ltr sent via US Mail to Plaintiff)(mmv) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2018. (mmv) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (jeg) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Department of Justice of the State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation Department, Entergy of Louisiana, Enterprise Leasing Co., Facebook, Hollydoow Productions, Louisiana Communication Service, Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, Louisiana Department of Family Services, Louisiana Department of Justice, Louisiana Department of Transportation, Louisiana Disciplinary Board Office of Disciplinary Counsel, Louisiana Health and Hospitals Department, Louisiana Housing Authority, Louisiana Office of Motor Vehicle, Louisiana Social Security Office, Lyft, LLC, Donald J. Trump, U.S. States Military, Uber filed by Shanta G. Phillips-Berry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Department of Transportation is a litigant

Latest cases where Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality is a litigant

Latest cases where Entergy Louisiana, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Louisiana is a litigant