Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2018 at 07:27:55 (UTC).

Philips v. Galena Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 Philips filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Galena Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet C. Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01747

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet C. Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corneilous Philips

Defendant

Galena Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael John Reilly

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Defendant Attorney

Andrew A. Cohen

Attorney at Winnick Ruben, Hoffnung, Peabody & Mendel, LLC

110 Whitney Ave.

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Galena Associates, LLC.(Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corneilous Philips. Galena Associates, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH ATTACHED INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS WHICH ARE IN EFFECT FOR THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/2/2018.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Galena Associates, LLC. (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2018 To File Response to #1 Complaint by Galena Associates, LLC. (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Cohen on behalf of Galena Associates, LLC (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Galena Associates, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

6 #1

Discovery Attachment

#6

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#5

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#4

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#3

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#2

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#1

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2018 To File Response to #1 Complaint by Galena Associates, LLC. (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Galena Associates, LLC.(Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corneilous Philips. Galena Associates, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Answer deadline updated for Galena Associates, LLC to 12/19/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2018 To File Response to #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/2/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH ATTACHED INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS WHICH ARE IN EFFECT FOR THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/2/2018.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2018 (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Galena Associates, LLC. (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2018 To File Response to #1 Complaint by Galena Associates, LLC. (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Cohen on behalf of Galena Associates, LLC (Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Galena Associates, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Complaint filed by Corneilous Philips, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2018 Discovery due by 4/24/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2018.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Galena Associates, LLC. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Galena Associates, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5019075.), filed by Corneilous Philips.(Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael John Reilly