This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2018 at 07:52:21 (UTC).

Philadelphia Insurance Co. v. Jakel Motors Incorporated

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 Philadelphia Insurance Co filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Jakel Motors Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01541

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philadelphia Insurance Co.

Defendant

JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Jason Marquoit

Attorney at Law Office of J. Jason Marquoit

7830 Sw 40Th Avenue, Suite 8

Portland, OR 97219

Defendant Attorney

Kristina J. Holm

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1120 Nw Couch Street, 10Th Floor

Portland, OR 97209-4128

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV27462 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5525598 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#4

(#4) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#5

(#5) Demand for Jury Trial by Jakel Motors Incorporated . Filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Demand for Jury Trial by Jakel Motors Incorporated . Filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV27462 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5525598 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less