This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 09:11:43 (UTC).

Peterson v. Madson et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 Peterson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Madson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-04058

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marshall Lawrence Peterson

Defendants

Erin Carpenter

Jeanette Mccolligan

Irma Daugherty

Shelly Heavilin

Richard Hotchkiss

Norma Wondel

Patrick Garvey

Diana Garvey

Barney Porter

Keith Ellis

Christine Ellis

Rosemary Butts

Ronald Wondel

Monica Fogelson

Brian Smith

Melanie Mccray

Gilbert Edwards

Bettie Hunnius

William Madson

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Trenton K. Bond

Kory D. Stubblefield

 

Court Documents

#111

(#111) ORDER. Defendants Camden County Commission and Commissioners Greg Hasty, Beverly Thomas, and Don Williams' motion to dismiss Counts II and III of the First Amended Petition, Doc. 90, is granted. Plaintiff Peterson's motion for leave to file a Second Amended Petition, Doc. 101, is denied. Signed on 12/29/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Documents 91, 98 and 109 are moot.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)

#103

(#103) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey, denying Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, Doc. 79 , and terminating Plaintiff's motion for order, Doc. 100 . (Barragan-Scott, Alana)

#77

(#77) ORDER. Defendants' motions to dismiss Count I of the First Amended Complaint, Docs. 58, 63, 64, and 66, are granted. The Court will abstain from exercising jurisdiction over Count I, and Count I is dismissed in its entirety. Plaintiff's motion to join a party plaintiff and to substitute a plaintiff for purposes of Count I, Doc. 56, and Ameren UE's motion to dismiss, Doc. 70, are denied as moot. The pending motions to dismiss the original complaint, Docs. 40, 45, 46, 48, 49, and 51, are denied as moot. Signed on 7/5/2017 by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) ORDER. Defendants Camden County Commission and Commissioners Greg Hasty, Beverly Thomas, and Don Williams' motion to dismiss Counts II and III of the First Amended Petition, Doc. 90, is granted. Plaintiff Peterson's motion for leave to file a Second Amended Petition, Doc. 101, is denied. Signed on 12/29/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Documents 91, 98 and 109 are moot.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey, denying Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, Doc. 79 , and terminating Plaintiff's motion for order, Doc. 100 . (Barragan-Scott, Alana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ORDER. Defendants' motions to dismiss Count I of the First Amended Complaint, Docs. 58, 63, 64, and 66, are granted. The Court will abstain from exercising jurisdiction over Count I, and Count I is dismissed in its entirety. Plaintiff's motion to join a party plaintiff and to substitute a plaintiff for purposes of Count I, Doc. 56, and Ameren UE's motion to dismiss, Doc. 70, are denied as moot. The pending motions to dismiss the original complaint, Docs. 40, 45, 46, 48, 49, and 51, are denied as moot. Signed on 7/5/2017 by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kory D. Stubblefield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trenton K. Bond