This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 04:36:57 (UTC).

Pertile et al v. General Motors, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2015 Pertile filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Pertile

Ginger Pertile

Defendants

DPH Holdings Corp.

General Motors, LLC

Delphi Automotive LLP

Robert Bosch Corporation

Northrop Grumman Space and Mission Systems Corporation

TRW Automotive Inc.

TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.

Kelsey-Hayes Company

Robert Bosch North America Corporation

TRW Automotive Holdings Corp

DPH-DAS LLC

Delphi Automotive Holdings Limited

Delphi Automotive Systems LLC

General Motors Company

TRW, Inc.

TRW Automotive U.S. LLC

TRW Automotive (LV) Corp.

Robert Bosch LLC

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anne Marie Dieruf

James Louis Gilbert(Designation Retained)

Darin Lee Schanker

Jeri J. Wettestad(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Kent Bryan Hanson

Kali Backer

Jordan Lee Lipp

Adam Patrick O'Brien

Mary Alice Wells

 

Court Documents

#20

#38

#77

#79

#81

#121

#312

#319

#333

#342

#355

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#355) ORDER Granting in Part TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc', Motion for Summary Judgment 188 by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/22/2017. (wjmlc2, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#342) ORDER denying 199 Motion to Exclude; denying 200 Motion to Exclude by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/19/2017. (wjmlc2, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#333) ORDER GRANTING 187 Defendant Kelsey-Hayes Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/15/2017. (wjmlc2, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#319) ORDER Overruling Defendant 303 General Motors LLC's Rule 72(A) Objection, by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/31/2017. (angar, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) ORDER denying 154 General Motors LLC'S Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/13/2017. (angar, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/17/16. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of General Motors, LLC's Finite Element Models for the GMT 900 Series 87 is DENIED. (bsimm, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) FINAL JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/06/15. (nmarb, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) JOINT ESI PROTOCOL entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/18/15.(bsimm, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Motion to Extend Deadline to Designate Nonparties at Fault Under C.R.S. 13-21-111.5 61 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. General Motor LLC's Motion for Protective Order 66 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/13/15. The Parties shall re-file stipulations that comply with the language of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before April 22, 2015, and those stipulations will be effective upon filing. (nmarb, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/18/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/27/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form 17 due by 5/7/2015. (bsimm, )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DPH HOLDINGS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where DPH-DAS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Delphi Automotive, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHROP GRUMMAN SPACE & MISSION SYSTEM CORP is a litigant