This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2018 at 07:01:33 (UTC).

PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC et al v. Imgur, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Imgur, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05596

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Level 3 Communication, LLC

PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Imgur, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Amory Sherman

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton Markiles, LLP

15260 Ventura Blvd., 20Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Wesley Warren Monroe

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton & Markiles, LLP

15260 Ventura Boulevard, 20Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Jeffrey F. Gersh

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton & Markiles, LLP

15260 Ventura Boulevard, 20Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Theodore Stephen Maceiko

Attorney at Maceiko IP

420 2Nd Street

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Viviana Boero Hedrick

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton & Markiles, LLP

15260 Ventura Blvd 20Th Floor

Sherman Okas, CA 91403

Stanley Hugh Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton & Markiles, LLP

15260 Ventura Boulevard, 20Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Sandeep Seth

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton & Markiles, LLP

15260 Ventura Boulevard, 20Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

David Dewey Wier, IV

Attorney at Level 3 Communications, LLC

1025 Eldorado Blvd

Broomfield, CO 80021

Defendant Attorney

Todd Richard Gregorian

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Imgur, Inc.. Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Richard Gregorian for Imgur, Inc. (Gregorian, Todd) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. Imgur, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Imgur, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Level 3 Communication, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing, Inc., Other Affiliate CenturyLink, Inc. for Level 3 Communication, LLC; Other Affiliate Kinetech, Inc., Other Affiliate Eurocapital Business Development, LLC, Other Affiliate SAM Venture Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate PersonalWeb, Inc., Other Affiliate Topodia Limited for PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Imgur, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12674300.). Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Imgur, Inc.. Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Richard Gregorian for Imgur, Inc. (Gregorian, Todd) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. Imgur, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Imgur, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Level 3 Communication, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing, Inc., Other Affiliate CenturyLink, Inc. for Level 3 Communication, LLC; Other Affiliate Kinetech, Inc., Other Affiliate Eurocapital Business Development, LLC, Other Affiliate SAM Venture Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate PersonalWeb, Inc., Other Affiliate Topodia Limited for PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Imgur, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12674300.). Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imgur, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PersonalWeb Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Level 3 Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Richard Gregorian