This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2018 at 07:00:12 (UTC).

PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. Airbnb, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 PersonalWeb Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Airbnb, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard R. Lloyd and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Howard R. Lloyd

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PersonalWeb Technologies LLC

Level 3 Communications LLC

100 Centurylink Drive

Monroe, LA 71203

PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Airbnb, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey F. Gersh

Attorney at IP Law Group, LLP

15030 Ventura Boulevard, #166

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

David D. Wier

Attorney at Assistant General Counsel

1025 Eldorado Boulevard

Broomfield, CO 80021

Michael A. Sherman

Attorney at IP Law Group, LLP

15030 Ventura Boulevard, #166

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Wesley Warren Monroe

Attorney at IP Law Group, LLP

15030 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 166

Sherman, CA 91403

Sandeep Seth

Attorney at Sethlaw

Two Allen Center, 1200 Smith Street, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Theodore Stephen Maceiko,

Attorney at Maceiko IP

420 2Nd Street

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #14 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

#14

(#14) AMENDED DOCUMENT by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC. Amendment to #9 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Related Cases. (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

13 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#13

(#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Wier ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12061411.) filed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2018) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC of Related Cases (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings.This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC.. (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

#8

(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Airbnb, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PersonalWeb Technologies LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12006381.). Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit C

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2018. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #14 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED DOCUMENT by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC. Amendment to #9 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Related Cases. (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Wier ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12061411.) filed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2018) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings.This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC.. (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC of Related Cases (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Airbnb, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/23/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC re #1 Complaint, (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC . (Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PersonalWeb Technologies LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12006381.). Filed byPersonalWeb Technologies LLC, Level 3 Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gersh, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.