This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:53:29 (UTC).

Perry C. Blair v. M. L. Montgomery

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Perry C Blair filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against M L Montgomery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08472

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Perry C. Blair

Calipatria, CA 92233

Respondent

M. L. Montgomery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Louis W Karlin

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

 

Court Documents

4 #2

Petition (Part 2)

4 #4

Petition (Part 4)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, ORDERING Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge submitted by Petitioner Perry C. Blair received on 10/2/18 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: The "yes" or "no" box regarding decision to consent was not checked off. (hr) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

part 3

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice G Rosenberg, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Perry C. Blair. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4) (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

4 #1

Petition (Part 1)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

4 #3

Petition (Part 3)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis W Karlin on behalf of Respondent M. L. Montgomery (Attorney Louis W Karlin added to party M. L. Montgomery(pty:res))(Karlin, Louis) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

2 #1

CV 111

1 #3

part 4

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING A RESPONSE/ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall serve and file a Notice of Appearance notifying the court of the name of the attorney who will have principal charge of the case, together with the address where the attorney may be served, and the attorneys telephone and fax number. Respondent M. L. Montgomery file Answer to the Petition not later than 12/26/2018. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 12/10/2018. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See Order for Further Details) (Attachments: #1 Petition (Part 1), #2 Petition (Part 2), #3 Petition (Part 3), #4 Petition (Part 4)) (kl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #1

part 2

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis W Karlin on behalf of Respondent M. L. Montgomery (Attorney Louis W Karlin added to party M. L. Montgomery(pty:res))(Karlin, Louis) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING A RESPONSE/ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall serve and file a Notice of Appearance notifying the court of the name of the attorney who will have principal charge of the case, together with the address where the attorney may be served, and the attorneys telephone and fax number. Respondent M. L. Montgomery file Answer to the Petition not later than 12/26/2018. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 12/10/2018. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See Order for Further Details) (Attachments: #1 Petition (Part 1), #2 Petition (Part 2), #3 Petition (Part 3), #4 Petition (Part 4)) (kl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, ORDERING Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge submitted by Petitioner Perry C. Blair received on 10/2/18 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: The "yes" or "no" box regarding decision to consent was not checked off. (hr) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice G Rosenberg, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Perry C. Blair. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4) (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.